Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Linden, Joel, filed a(n) Civil - Unlimited case represented by Bales, Peter Higgins, against Therinject Llc, represented by Nicholas, Craig M, in the jurisdiction of San Diego County. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts with John S. Meyer presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateJanuary 13, 2016 |
CategoryCivil - Unlimited |
Time To Trial338 days |
Last RefreshedSeptember 06, 2022 |
||
Filing LocationSan Diego County, CA |
||
Case Cycle Time406 days |
Original Summons filed by Linden, Joel. Refers to: Therinject LLC
Date: 2016-01-13T00:00:00Complaint filed by Linden, Joel. Refers to: Therinject LLC
Date: 2016-01-13T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Linden, Joel. Refers to: Therinject LLC
Date: 2016-01-13T00:00:00Proof of Service (of Ex Parte Application and Supporting Documents) filed by Linden, Joel.
Date: 2016-03-24T00:00:00Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed by Therinject LLC.
Date: 2016-02-24T00:00:00Amended Complaint (1st for Declaratory Relief) filed by Linden, Joel. Refers to: Therinject LLC
Date: 2016-03-03T00:00:00Case initiation form printed.
Date: 2016-01-14T00:00:00Demurrer filed by Therinject LLC.
Date: 2016-02-24T00:00:00Proof of Service filed by Therinject LLC.
Date: 2016-02-24T00:00:00Answer filed by Therinject LLC.
Date: 2016-04-28T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default (DENIED) filed by Linden, Joel. Refers to: Therinject LLC
Date: 2016-02-26T00:00:00Order - Other (Proposed) submitted by Therinject LLC received but not filed on 02/24/2016.
Date: 2016-02-24T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Ex Parte heard 03/29/2016 08:30:00 AM.
Date: 2016-03-29T00:00:00Cross-Complaint filed by Therinject LLC. Refers to: Linden, Joel
Date: 2016-04-28T00:00:00Stipulation - Other - Fee Due (Protective Order) filed by Linden, Joel; Therinject LLC.
Date: 2016-05-25T00:00:00Answer filed by Linden, Joel.
Date: 2016-06-02T00:00:00Correspondence submitted by Therinject LLC received but not filed on 04/06/2016.
Date: 2016-04-06T00:00:00Motion to Compel Discovery filed by Therinject LLC.
Date: 2016-07-08T00:00:00Notice - Other (of Entry of Stipulated Protective Order) filed by Linden, Joel.
Date: 2016-06-27T00:00:00Proof of Service filed by Therinject LLC.
Date: 2016-07-15T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Ex Parte heard 07/13/2016 08:30:00 AM.
Date: 2016-07-13T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed by Therinject LLC.
Date: 2016-07-15T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed by Therinject LLC.
Date: 2016-10-05T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed by Linden, Joel.
Date: 2016-07-21T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Civil Case Management Conference heard 08/05/2016 09:30:00 AM.
Date: 2016-08-05T00:00:00Notice of Jury Fee Deposit filed by Therinject LLC.
Date: 2016-07-26T00:00:00Notice of Rescheduled Hearing SD generated.
Date: 2016-08-05T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed by Linden, Joel.
Date: 2016-09-23T00:00:00Notice of Rescheduled Hearing SD generated.
Date: 2016-10-07T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed by Linden, Joel.
Date: 2016-10-20T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Civil Case Management Conference heard 10/07/2016 10:30:00 AM.
Date: 2016-10-07T00:00:00Reply to Opposition of Noticed Motion and Supporting Declarations filed by Linden, Joel.
Date: 2016-10-28T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Motion Hearing (Civil) heard 11/04/2016 10:30:00 AM.
Date: 2016-11-04T00:00:00Proof of Service filed by Linden, Joel.
Date: 2016-10-28T00:00:00Objections (Therinject LLC's Evidentiary Objections ISO Opposition) filed by Therinject LLC.
Date: 2016-10-24T00:00:00Proof of Service (Proof of Service) filed by Therinject LLC.
Date: 2016-10-24T00:00:00[Another document for ROA# 82]
Date: 2016-10-25T00:00:00Order - Other (PROTECTIVE ORDER) filed by Linden, Joel.
Date: 2016-11-18T00:00:00Notice of Lodgment filed by Therinject LLC.
Date: 2016-10-25T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Civil Case Management Conference heard 11/04/2016 10:30:00 AM.
Date: 2016-11-04T00:00:00Proof of Service (Proof of Service) filed by Therinject LLC.
Date: 2016-10-31T00:00:00Notice - Other (Therinject LLC's Notice of Request for Sanctions) filed by Therinject LLC.
Date: 2016-10-24T00:00:00Notice of Rescheduled Hearing SD generated.
Date: 2016-11-04T00:00:00Notice of Hearing SD generated.
Date: 2016-12-16T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed by Therinject LLC.
Date: 2016-11-23T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed by Linden, Joel.
Date: 2016-12-01T00:00:00Notice - Other (Notice of Entry of Protective Order) filed by Linden, Joel.
Date: 2016-12-06T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Civil Case Management Conference heard 12/16/2016 10:30:00 AM.
Date: 2016-12-16T00:00:00Notice of Withdrawal of Counsel filed by Therinject LLC.
Date: 2016-12-28T00:00:00Proof of Service filed by Therinject LLC.
Date: 2016-11-23T00:00:00Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action (Plaintiff signed) filed by Therinject LLC.
Date: February 17, 2017Proof of Service by Mail filed by Therinject LLC.
Date: 2016-12-28T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.