Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Kyce & Yara Llc filed a(n) Unlawful Detainer - Property case in the jurisdiction of San Diego County. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts with Joseph P. Brannigan presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateJanuary 06, 2016 |
CategoryCivil - Limited |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions56 days |
Filing LocationSan Diego County, CA |
Matter TypeUnlawful Detainer |
|
Case Cycle Time309 days |
Original Summons filed by Kyce & Yara LLC.
Date: 2016-01-06T00:00:00Declaration - Other filed by Kyce & Yara LLC.
Date: 2016-01-06T00:00:00E-filing transaction partially accepted.
Date: 2016-01-07T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney filed by Maroki, Nash.
Date: 2016-03-22T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail filed by Kyce & Yara LLC.
Date: 2016-03-09T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Kyce & Yara LLC.
Date: 2016-01-06T00:00:00Demurrer filed by Maroki, Nash.
Date: 2016-01-27T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default of Unnamed Tenants (DENIED) filed by Kyce & Yara LLC.
Date: 2016-03-09T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail filed by Kyce & Yara LLC.
Date: 2016-01-26T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Demurrer / Motion to Strike heard 03/02/2016 01:30:00 PM.
Date: 2016-03-02T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail filed by Kyce & Yara LLC.
Date: 2016-04-25T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Unlawful Detainer Court Trial heard 05/02/2016 09:00:00 AM.
Date: 2016-05-02T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Unlawful Detainer Court Trial heard 04/29/2016 08:30:00 AM.
Date: 2016-04-29T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default of Unnamed Tenants filed by Kyce & Yara LLC.
Date: 2016-04-25T00:00:00Case initiation form printed.
Date: 2016-01-07T00:00:00Opposition - Other (to Nash Marokis Demurrer to Complaint) filed by Kyce & Yara LLC.
Date: 2016-02-17T00:00:00Ex Parte Application - Other and Supporting Documents (Trial Continuance) filed by Kyce & Yara LLC.
Date: 2016-04-20T00:00:00Trial Brief filed by Kyce & Yara LLC.
Date: 2016-04-29T00:00:00Complaint Demanding Less than $10,000 filed by Kyce & Yara LLC. Refers to: Maroki, Nash
Date: 2016-01-06T00:00:00Unlawful Detainer Court Trial scheduled for 04/22/2016 at 08:30:00 AM at Central in C-07 .
Date: 2016-04-07T00:00:00Request to Set Case for Trial (At Issue Memorandum) filed by Maroki, Nash.
Date: 2016-04-06T00:00:00Amended Answer (First) filed by Maroki, Nash.
Date: 2016-04-01T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Unlawful Detainer Court Trial heard 05/03/2016 02:00:00 PM.
Date: 2016-05-03T00:00:00Notice of Errata filed by Maroki, Nash.
Date: 2016-05-02T00:00:00Answer filed by Maroki, Nash.
Date: 2016-03-07T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Ex Parte heard 04/21/2016 01:15:00 PM.
Date: 2016-04-21T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Judgment filed by Maroki, Nash.
Date: 2016-07-14T00:00:00Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (Minutes Only) SD generated.
Date: 2016-06-06T00:00:00Opposition - Other filed by Kyce & Yara LLC.
Date: 2016-06-21T00:00:00Trial Brief filed by Maroki, Nash.
Date: 2016-04-29T00:00:00Notice of Default SD generated.
Date: August 17, 2016Notice of Lodgment submitted by Relph, Christine received but not filed on 06/27/2016.
Date: 2016-06-27T00:00:00Judgment filed by The Superior Court of San Diego.
Date: 2016-07-13T00:00:00Remittitur filed by The Superior Court of San Diego.
Date: November 08, 2016Proof of Service filed by Kyce & Yara LLC.
Date: 2016-06-21T00:00:00Declaration - Other filed by Kyce & Yara LLC.
Date: 2016-06-21T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice filed by Kyce & Yara LLC.
Date: 2016-06-21T00:00:00Memorandum of Costs (Summary) filed by Maroki, Nash.
Date: 2016-05-25T00:00:00Memorandum of Costs (Summary) filed by Maroki, Nash.
Date: 2016-06-22T00:00:00Notice of Appeal filed by Kyce & Yara LLC. Refers to: Maroki, Nash
Date: August 05, 2016Miscellaneous Minute Order Finalized.
Date: 2016-06-06T00:00:00Abstract of Judgment issued.
Date: August 17, 2016Miscellaneous Minute Order Finalized.
Date: 2016-07-13T00:00:00Miscellaneous Minute Order Finalized.
Date: November 10, 2016Notice of Failure to Clear Default filed by The Superior Court of San Diego.
Date: September 14, 2016For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.