Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Barrett, Lewis Armando, filed a(n) General Small Claims - Small Claims case against Favila, Norberto Suarez, Favila, Hil ; Aka : Favila, Anthony, in the jurisdiction of San Diego County. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts with Louis R. Hanoian presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 13, 2016 |
CategorySmall Claims |
Last RefreshedMarch 03, 2021 |
Practice AreaSmall Claims |
Filing LocationSan Diego County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Small Claims |
Case initiation form printed.
Date: 2015-12-14T00:00:00Trial De Novo scheduled for 08/05/2016 at 09:00:00 AM at Central in C-54 Louis R. Hanoian.
Date: 2016-06-17T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims) SD generated.
Date: 2016-03-17T00:00:00Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail SD generated.
Date: 2016-04-19T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Small Claims Court Trial heard 03/17/2016 08:00:00 AM.
Date: 2016-03-17T00:00:00Notice of Hearing SD generated.
Date: February 01, 2017Minutes finalized for Trial De Novo heard 10/21/2016 09:00:00 AM.
Date: 2016-10-21T00:00:00Abstract of Judgment issued.
Date: May 23, 2018Assignment of Judgment submitted by Barrett, Lewis Armando rejected on 12/05/2017.
Date: December 05, 2017Minutes finalized for Motion Hearing (Small Claims) heard 03/08/2017 09:30:00 AM.
Date: March 08, 2017Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (Minutes Only) SD generated.
Date: March 08, 2017Abstract of Judgment submitted by Van Nuys Financial rejected on 04/27/2018.
Date: April 27, 2018Notice of Change of Address / Telephone Number filed by Van Nuys Financial.
Date: April 26, 2018Judgment on Small Claims Appeal SD generated.
Date: 2016-10-21T00:00:00Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail SD generated.
Date: 2016-12-30T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.