Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Khesin, Vadim, filed a(n) General Small Claims - Small Claims case against The Premiere Residential, Llc, Stofan, Lisa, Scala Gp, Inc., in the jurisdiction of San Diego County. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts with Joseph P. Brannigan presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 01, 2018 |
CategorySmall Claims |
Last RefreshedMarch 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaSmall Claims |
Filing LocationSan Diego County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Small Claims |
Minutes finalized for Trial De Novo heard 01/29/2016 08:30:00 AM.
Date: January 29, 2016Trial De Novo scheduled for 01/29/2016 at 08:30:00 AM at Central in C-25 Joseph P. Brannigan.
Date: December 23, 2015Judgment on Small Claims Appeal SD generated.
Date: March 18, 2016Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims) SD generated.
Date: 2015-08-27T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Small Claims Court Trial heard 08/27/2015 09:15:00 AM.
Date: 2015-08-27T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims) SD generated.
Date: January 29, 2016For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.