Interinsurance Exchange Of The Automobile Club An Interinsurance Exchange,
filed a(n)
Automobile -
Torts
case
represented by
Corona, Salvador,
against
Ean Holding Llc,
Vazquez, Alejandro,
in the jurisdiction of San Diego County.
This case was filed in
San Diego County
Superior Courts
with Ronald S. Prager presiding.
Case Details for
Interinsurance Exchange Of The Automobile Club An Interinsurance Exchange v. Ean Holding Llc
, et al.
Case Events for
Interinsurance Exchange Of The Automobile Club An Interinsurance Exchange v. Ean Holding Llc
, et al.
Date
Type
Description
September 17, 2015
Docket Event
Civil Case Management Conference scheduled for 12/11/2015 at 01:00:00 PM at Central in C-71 Ronald S. Prager was vacated.
August 28, 2015
Docket Event
Complaint Demanding More than $10,000 but less than $25,000 dismissed with prejudice as to Interinsurance Exchange Of The Automobile Club An Interinsurance Exchange.
August 28, 2015
Docket Event
Complaint Demanding More than $10,000 but less than $25,000 dismissed with prejudice as to Vazquez, Alejandro .
August 28, 2015
Docket Event
Complaint Demanding More than $10,000 but less than $25,000 dismissed with prejudice as to Ean Holding LLC.
August 28, 2015
Docket Event
Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action filed by Interinsurance Exchange Of The Automobile Club An Interinsurance Exchange. Refers to: Ean Holding LLC; Vazquez, Alejandro
August 19, 2015
Docket Event
Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed by Interinsurance Exchange Of The Automobile Club An Interinsurance Exchange. Refers to: Vazquez, Alejandro
July 23, 2015
Docket Event
Proof of Service filed by Interinsurance Exchange Of The Automobile Club An Interinsurance Exchange.
July 08, 2015
Docket Event
Notice of Case Assignment SD Case initiation form printed.
July 08, 2015
Docket Event
Summons issued.
July 08, 2015
Docket Event
Civil Case Management Conference scheduled for 12/11/2015 at 01:00:00 PM at Central in C-71 Ronald S. Prager.