Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Weinstein, Peter D, filed a(n) Economic Torts - Torts case represented by Corrinet, Mark; Sartain, Jeromye V; Stathakis, Dean G, against Musick, Eleanor, Procopio Cory Hargreaves & Savitch Llp, represented by Tangri, Ragesh K, in the jurisdiction of San Diego County. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts with Ronald S. Prager presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateJune 12, 2015 |
CategoryCivil - Unlimited |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions104 days |
Filing LocationSan Diego County, CA |
Matter TypeEconomic Torts |
|
Case Cycle Time117 days |
Opposition - Other (Opposition to Demurrer) filed by Weinstein, Peter D.
Date: 2015-09-11T00:00:00Motion to Strike filed by Procopio Cory Hargreaves & Savitch LLP; Musick, Eleanor.
Date: 2015-07-20T00:00:00Demurrer filed by Procopio Cory Hargreaves & Savitch LLP; Musick, Eleanor.
Date: 2015-07-20T00:00:00Case initiation form printed.
Date: 2015-06-15T00:00:00Declaration - Other (Declaration of Peter D Weinstein) filed by Weinstein, Peter D.
Date: 2015-09-11T00:00:00Opposition - Other (Opposition to Motion to Strike) filed by Weinstein, Peter D.
Date: 2015-09-11T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Ex Parte heard 08/27/2015 08:15:00 AM.
Date: 2015-08-27T00:00:00Notice of Appearance filed by Weinstein, Peter D.
Date: 2015-09-10T00:00:00Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail SD generated.
Date: September 25, 2015Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (Minutes Only) SD generated.
Date: September 25, 2015Minutes finalized for Multiple Events heard 09/25/2015 10:00:00 AM.
Date: September 25, 2015Judgment of Dismissal filed by Procopio Cory Hargreaves & Savitch LLP; Musick, Eleanor.
Date: October 07, 2015For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.