Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Myers, Janet Kristine, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case represented by Geoulla, Daniel D, against Colorado River Adventures Inc; Esa : California River Adventures, Kq Ranch And Campground Llc; Esa : Kq Ranch Rv Camping Resort, Kq Ranch And Campgroup Llc, represented by Juskie, Robert M, in the jurisdiction of San Diego County. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts with Joel R. Wohlfeil presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateJanuary 23, 2015 |
CategoryCivil - Unlimited |
Time To Trial273 days |
Last RefreshedMay 14, 2022 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions1043 days |
Filing LocationSan Diego County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
|
Case Cycle Time1043 days |
Order on Court Fee Waiver filed by Myers, Janet Kristine.
Date: 2015-01-26T00:00:00Case initiation form printed.
Date: 2015-01-26T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Civil Case Management Conference heard 07/17/2015 01:30:00 PM.
Date: 2015-07-17T00:00:00Original Summons filed by Myers, Janet Kristine.
Date: 2015-07-20T00:00:00Motion to Quash (Civil) scheduled for 10/02/2015 at 09:00:00 AM at Central in C-73 Joel R. Wohlfeil.
Date: 2015-09-09T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed by Myers, Janet Kristine.
Date: 2015-10-07T00:00:00Notice of Hearing SD generated.
Date: 2015-10-23T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Motion to Quash (Civil) heard 10/02/2015 09:00:00 AM.
Date: 2015-10-02T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Civil Case Management Conference heard 10/23/2015 02:00:00 PM.
Date: 2015-10-23T00:00:00Order on Court Fee Waiver filed by Myers, Janet Kristine.
Date: 2015-12-01T00:00:00Request to Waive Additional Court Fees filed by Myers, Janet Kristine.
Date: 2015-11-25T00:00:00Declaration - Other filed by Myers, Janet Kristine.
Date: 2016-03-28T00:00:00Request for Out of State Commission submitted by KQ Ranch RV Camping Resort rejected on 09/02/2016.
Date: 2016-09-02T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Ex Parte heard 03/29/2016 08:30:00 AM.
Date: 2016-03-29T00:00:00Opposition - Other filed by Myers, Janet Kristine.
Date: 2016-06-28T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Ex Parte heard 06/29/2016 08:30:00 AM.
Date: 2016-06-29T00:00:00[Another document for ROA# 68]
Date: 2016-09-09T00:00:00[Another document for ROA# 74]
Date: 2016-09-09T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Multiple Events heard 09/30/2016 09:00:00 AM.
Date: 2016-09-30T00:00:00Proposed Order filed by Myers, Janet Kristine.
Date: 2016-12-12T00:00:00Ex Parte Application - Other and Supporting Documents filed by Myers, Janet Kristine.
Date: 2016-12-12T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Discovery Hearing heard 12/02/2016 09:00:00 AM.
Date: 2016-12-02T00:00:00Opposition to Noticed Motion and Supporting Declarations filed by Myers, Janet Kristine.
Date: 2016-11-21T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Ex Parte heard 09/15/2016 08:30:00 AM.
Date: 2016-09-15T00:00:00Association of Attorney filed by Myers, Janet Kristine.
Date: 2016-11-16T00:00:00Order - Other (Continue Trial Date) filed by Myers, Janet Kristine.
Date: April 10, 2017Minutes finalized for Ex Parte heard 12/13/2016 08:30:00 AM.
Date: 2016-12-13T00:00:00E-filing transaction partially accepted.
Date: 2017-04-04T00:00:00Miscellaneous Minute Order Finalized.
Date: July 26, 2017Minutes finalized for Ex Parte heard 04/04/2017 08:30:00 AM.
Date: 2017-04-04T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Discovery Hearing heard 01/06/2017 09:00:00 AM.
Date: 2017-01-06T00:00:00Notice of Dismissal by Court SD generated.
Date: July 26, 2017Miscellaneous Minute Order Finalized.
Date: December 01, 2017Notice of Ruling filed by Myers, Janet Kristine.
Date: April 06, 2017Notice of Dismissal SD generated.
Date: December 01, 2017For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.