Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Peters, Arryn, Eddleman, Andrew, filed a(n) General Small Claims - Small Claims case against Adhami, Sharam, Adhami, Sandy, in the jurisdiction of San Diego County. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts with Kenneth K. So presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 25, 2016 |
CategorySmall Claims |
Last RefreshedMarch 05, 2021 |
Practice AreaSmall Claims |
Filing LocationSan Diego County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Small Claims |
SC100 Plaintiff Claim and Order to Defendant SD generated.
Date: 2014-12-09T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Small Claims Court Trial heard 09/15/2015 01:00:00 PM.
Date: 2015-09-15T00:00:00The Small Claims Court Trial was rescheduled to 09/15/2015 at 01:00:00 PM in C-22 before at Central.
Date: 2015-06-17T00:00:00The Small Claims Court Trial was rescheduled to 07/02/2015 at 01:00:00 PM in C-22 before at Central.
Date: 2015-03-11T00:00:00Trial De Novo scheduled for 07/08/2016 at 08:30:00 AM at Central in C-55 Kenneth K. So.
Date: 2016-06-01T00:00:00The Trial De Novo was rescheduled to 07/15/2016 at 08:30:00 AM in C-55 before Kenneth K. So at Central.
Date: 2016-06-13T00:00:00Miscellaneous Minute Order Finalized.
Date: 2016-06-13T00:00:00Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail SD generated.
Date: August 09, 2016Minutes finalized for Trial De Novo heard 07/15/2016 08:30:00 AM.
Date: July 15, 2016Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims) SD generated.
Date: 2016-01-25T00:00:00Acknowledgement of Satisfaction of Judgment SD generated.
Date: August 01, 2016Minutes finalized for Small Claims Court Trial heard 01/25/2016 01:00:00 PM.
Date: 2016-01-25T00:00:00Judgment on Small Claims Appeal SD generated.
Date: 2016-07-15T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.