Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Progressive West Insurance Company, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Nivinskus, Mark R, against Roberts, Cynthia, in the jurisdiction of San Diego County. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts with Joel R. Wohlfeil presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateDecember 31, 2014 |
CategoryCivil - Limited |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions69 days |
Filing LocationSan Diego County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
|
Case Cycle Time566 days |
Case initiation form printed.
Date: 2015-01-02T00:00:00Original Summons filed by PROGRESSIVE WEST INSURANCE COMPANY. Refers to: ROBERTS, CYNTHIA
Date: 2014-12-31T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed by PROGRESSIVE WEST INSURANCE COMPANY.
Date: May 14, 2015Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by PROGRESSIVE WEST INSURANCE COMPANY. Refers to: ROBERTS, CYNTHIA
Date: 2014-12-31T00:00:00DL-30 issued.
Date: July 18, 2016Abstract of Judgment issued.
Date: July 19, 2016For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.