Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Brickrow Property Management Inc, Antou, Ammelie, filed a(n) Unlawful Detainer - Property case represented by Wedeking, Steven, against Garza, Angela, in the jurisdiction of San Diego County. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
||
Filing DateDecember 31, 2014 |
CategoryCivil - Limited |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions29 days |
Filing LocationSan Diego County, CA |
Matter TypeUnlawful Detainer |
|
Case Cycle Time1097 days |
Answer filed by Garza, Angela.
Date: 2015-01-12T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Unlawful Detainer Court Trial heard 01/29/2015 08:10:00 AM.
Date: January 29, 2015Unlawful Detainer Court Trial scheduled for 01/29/2015 at 08:10:00 AM at North County in N-08 .
Date: 2015-01-14T00:00:00Original Summons filed by Antou, Ammelie; BRICKROW PROPERTY MANAGEMENT INC. Refers to: Garza, Angela
Date: 2014-12-31T00:00:00Order on Court Fee Waiver filed by Garza, Angela.
Date: 2015-01-12T00:00:00Case initiation form printed.
Date: 2014-12-31T00:00:00Writ of Possession issued.
Date: February 03, 2015For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.