Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
County Of San Diego, filed a(n) Civil - Unlimited case against Anthology Restaurant Group Llc; Dba : Anthology, in the jurisdiction of San Diego County. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts with Lisa Schall presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateOctober 01, 2014 |
CategoryCivil - Unlimited |
Last RefreshedFebruary 23, 2021 |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions2 days |
Filing LocationSan Diego County, CA |
|
Case Cycle Time133 days |
Abstract of Judgment submitted by County of San Diego rejected on 02/11/2015.
Date: February 11, 2015Case initiation form printed.
Date: October 03, 2014Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 11, 2015 | Docket Event |
Notice to Filing Party SD Abstract of Judgment submitted by County of San Diego rejected on 02/11/2015. |
|
November 04, 2014 | Docket Event | Satisfaction of Judgment - full filed by County of San Diego. Refers to: Anthology Restaurant Group LLC | |
October 14, 2014 | Docket Event | **Abstract Received** | |
October 03, 2014 | Docket Event | Judgment was entered as follows: Judgment entered for County of San Diego and against Anthology Restaurant Group LLC for $ 46072.64, punitive damages: $ 0.00, attorney fees: $ 0.00, interest: $ 0.00, prejudgment costs: $ 0.00, other costs: $ 0.00, amount payable to court: $ .00, for a grand total of $ 46072.64. | |
October 03, 2014 | Docket Event |
Notice of Case Assignment SD Case initiation form printed. |
|
October 01, 2014 | Docket Event | Tax Collector's Certificate in Support of Petition for Summary Judgment filed by County of San Diego. Refers to: Anthology Restaurant Group LLC | |
October 01, 2014 | Docket Event | Petition for Summary Judgment and Judgment (Rev. & Tax Code Section 3101) filed by County of San Diego. Refers to: Anthology Restaurant Group LLC | |
October 01, 2014 | Docket Event |
Case assigned to Judicial Officer Schall, Lisa.
Judge: Schall Lisa |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.