Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Jasso, Carlos Gabriel, filed a(n) Harassment - Torts case against Valdez, Francisco Javier, Lora, Karla, in the jurisdiction of San Diego County. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts with Theodore M. Weathers presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 24, 2014 |
CategoryCivil - Unlimited |
Last RefreshedFebruary 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSan Diego County, CA |
Matter TypeHarassment |
Case Cycle Time58 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 21, 2014 | Docket Event | Proof of Personal Service - Petition (Non Service) filed by JASSO, CARLOS GABRIEL. Refers to: VALDEZ, FRANCISCO | |
August 18, 2014 | Docket Event | Minutes finalized for Hearing on Restraining Order heard 08/18/2014 01:30:00 PM. | |
August 18, 2014 | Docket Event | Restraining order as requested against Frank Alvarez was granted. | |
August 18, 2014 | Docket Event | Civil Harassment Restraining Order After Hearing (CLETS-CHO) filed by JASSO, CARLOS GABRIEL. Refers to: VALDEZ, FRANCISCO | |
July 09, 2014 | Docket Event | Hearing on Restraining Order continued pursuant to Court's motion to 08/18/2014 at 01:30PM before Judge Theodore M. Weathers. | |
July 09, 2014 | Docket Event | Minutes finalized for Hearing on Restraining Order heard 07/09/2014 01:30:00 PM. | |
June 27, 2014 | Docket Event | Proof of Personal Service - Petition filed by JASSO, CARLOS GABRIEL. Refers to: LORA, KARLA | |
June 26, 2014 | Docket Event | Response to Request for Civil Harassment Restraining Orders filed by LORA, KARLA. Refers to: JASSO, CARLOS | |
June 26, 2014 | Docket Event | Response to Request for Civil Harassment Restraining Orders (AND POS) filed by VALDEZ, FRANCISCO JAVIER. Refers to: JASSO, CARLOS | |
June 24, 2014 | Docket Event | Notice of Court Hearing filed by JASSO, CARLOS GABRIEL. Refers to: VALDEZ, FRANCISCO |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.