Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Estate Of Elizabeth Alexander, filed a(n) Malpractice - Torts case represented by Cheeks, Benjamin J, in the jurisdiction of San Diego County. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts Superior with Keri Katz presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeKeri Katz Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateMay 20, 2014 |
CategoryCivil - Unlimited |
Time To Trial416 days |
Last RefreshedAugust 07, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions303 days |
Filing LocationSan Diego County, CA |
Matter TypeMalpractice |
|
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Case Cycle Time2288 days |
Cooper, Daniel A (Carroll Kelly Trotter Franzen Mcbride & P 225 Broadway Ste 1575 San Diego Ca 92101)
La Jolla Emergency Specialists; Dba : La Jolla Emergencey Physicians Medical Group;Esa : La Jolla Emergencey Physicians Medical Group (Defendant, Respondent On Appeal)
Case Management Statement filed by Alexander, Christopher.
Date: 2015-03-17T00:00:00Notice of Jury Fee Deposit submitted by Alexander, Christopher rejected on 03/23/2015.
Date: 2015-03-23T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed by Estate of Elizabeth Alexander; McDermet, Jacquelyn.
Date: 2015-03-17T00:00:00Notice of Jury Fee Deposit filed by Shieh, Marie.
Date: 2015-03-20T00:00:00Returned Mail (Re: Rejection of Notice of Jury Fee Deposit) filed by Alexander, Christopher.
Date: 2015-04-17T00:00:00Notice of Jury Fee Deposit filed by SCRIPPS MEMORIAL HOSPITAL LA JOLLA.
Date: 2015-03-12T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Multiple Events heard 03/20/2015 11:00:00 AM.
Date: 2015-03-20T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail filed by Ritt, Donald.
Date: 2015-06-25T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed by Shieh, Marie.
Date: 2015-06-26T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed by Ritt, Donald.
Date: 2015-06-25T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed by Scripps Memorial Hospital La Jolla.
Date: 2015-06-23T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed by Lugo, Gustavo.
Date: 2015-06-25T00:00:00Notice of Change of Firm Name filed by Ritt, Donald.
Date: 2015-06-03T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed by Wiesner, Christopher.
Date: 2015-06-19T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Civil Case Management Conference heard 07/10/2015 11:00:00 AM.
Date: 2015-07-10T00:00:00Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (Minutes Only) SD generated.
Date: 2015-07-29T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Multiple Events heard 07/10/2015 11:00:00 AM.
Date: 2015-07-10T00:00:00Miscellaneous Minute Order Finalized.
Date: 2015-07-29T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Ex Parte heard 11/19/2015 08:30:00 AM.
Date: 2015-11-19T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Demurrer / Motion to Strike heard 10/30/2015 11:00:00 AM.
Date: 2015-10-30T00:00:00Notice of Rescheduled Hearing SD generated.
Date: 2015-10-30T00:00:00Answer filed by Ritt, Donald.
Date: 2015-11-20T00:00:00Answer filed by La Jolla Emergencey Physicians Medical Group; Wiesner, Christopher.
Date: 2015-11-20T00:00:00Answer (w/proof of service) filed by Shieh, Marie.
Date: 2015-11-06T00:00:00Answer (with proof of service) filed by Mehta, Preeti.
Date: 2015-11-20T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail (Answer) filed by Ritt, Donald.
Date: 2015-11-20T00:00:00Amended Answer filed by Lugo, Gustavo.
Date: 2015-11-10T00:00:00Statement of Undisputed Facts filed by Wiesner, Christopher; La Jolla Emergency Specialists.
Date: 2016-02-24T00:00:00Joinder to Motion and Supporting Declarations filed by Lugo, Gustavo.
Date: 2016-03-14T00:00:00[Another document for ROA# 259]
Date: 2016-04-13T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Multiple Events heard 03/15/2016 08:30:00 AM.
Date: 2016-03-15T00:00:00Statement of Undisputed Facts (Separate Statement of Undisputed Facts) filed by Lugo, Gustavo.
Date: 2016-04-07T00:00:00Declaration - Other filed by Lugo, Gustavo.
Date: 2016-04-13T00:00:00Ex Parte Application - Other and Supporting Documents filed by Ritt, Donald.
Date: 2016-03-14T00:00:00Motion for Summary Judgment and/or Adjudication filed by Ritt, Donald.
Date: 2016-03-16T00:00:00Motion for Summary Judgment and/or Adjudication (and Supporting Documents) filed by Mehta, Preeti.
Date: 2016-04-15T00:00:00Opposition to Noticed Motion and Supporting Declarations filed by Ritt, Donald.
Date: 2016-04-25T00:00:00Motion for Summary Judgment and/or Adjudication (and Supporting Documents) filed by Shieh, Marie.
Date: 2016-04-18T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Ex Parte heard 04/28/2016 08:30:00 AM.
Date: 2016-04-28T00:00:00Opposition to Noticed Motion and Supporting Declarations filed by Lugo, Gustavo.
Date: 2016-04-25T00:00:00Opposition - Other (to Ex Parte) filed by Wiesner, Christopher.
Date: 2016-04-28T00:00:00Declaration - Other filed by Lugo, Gustavo.
Date: 2016-04-25T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Motion Hearing (Civil) heard 05/06/2016 11:00:00 AM.
Date: 2016-05-06T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Ex Parte heard 05/03/2016 08:30:00 AM.
Date: 2016-05-03T00:00:00Reply to Opposition of Noticed Motion and Supporting Declarations filed by Ritt, Donald.
Date: 2016-05-27T00:00:00Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Party submitted by Alexander, Clenton rejected on 05/25/2016.
Date: 2016-05-25T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Multiple Events heard 06/10/2016 11:00:00 AM.
Date: 2016-06-10T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Multiple Events heard 06/03/2016 11:00:00 AM.
Date: 2016-06-03T00:00:00Proof of Service filed by Scripps Memorial Hospital La Jolla.
Date: 2018-11-01T00:00:00[Another document for ROA# 549]
Date: 2018-10-30T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Judgment Debtor Exam (Civil) heard 12/07/2018 08:30:00 AM.
Date: 2018-12-07T00:00:00Abstract of Judgment submitted by Scripps Memorial Hospital La Jolla rejected on 12/12/2018.
Date: 2018-12-12T00:00:00Proposed Order submitted by Scripps Memorial Hospital La Jolla received but not filed on 12/18/2019.
Date: 2019-12-18T00:00:00Abstract of Judgment issued.
Date: 2019-03-20T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Judgment Debtor Exam (Civil) heard 01/11/2019 08:30:00 AM.
Date: 2019-01-11T00:00:00Proof of Service filed by Scripps Memorial Hospital La Jolla.
Date: 2020-01-27T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Judgment Debtor Exam (Civil) heard 03/15/2019 08:30:00 AM.
Date: 2019-03-15T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address / Telephone Number filed by Alexander, Christopher.
Date: 2019-01-09T00:00:00Motion - Other (to disqualify the Honorable Randa Trapp) filed by Alexander, Christopher.
Date: 2020-02-14T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Discovery Hearing heard 08/12/2020 01:30:00 PM.
Date: 2020-08-12T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail filed by Alexander, Christopher.
Date: 2020-05-29T00:00:00Proof of Service filed by Scripps Memorial Hospital La Jolla.
Date: 2020-08-07T00:00:00Notice - Other (of informal discovery conference) filed by Scripps Memorial Hospital La Jolla.
Date: 2020-07-23T00:00:00Discovery Hearing scheduled for 04/24/2020 at 11:00:00 AM at Central in C-70 Randa Trapp was vacated.
Date: 2020-05-13T00:00:00E-filing transaction partially accepted.
Date: 2020-07-31T00:00:00Notice of Hearing SD generated.
Date: 2020-07-23T00:00:00Order (Order from the Court of Appeal) filed by The Superior Court of San Diego.
Date: 2020-08-12T00:00:00Status Conference (Civil) scheduled for 07/10/2020 at 10:15:00 AM at Central in C-70 Randa Trapp.
Date: 2020-06-26T00:00:00Opposition to Noticed Motion and Supporting Declarations filed by Alexander, Christopher.
Date: 2020-05-26T00:00:00Proof of Service (of notice, motions) filed by Scripps Memorial Hospital La Jolla.
Date: 2020-07-23T00:00:00Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail SD generated.
Date: 2020-03-12T00:00:00Order (order denying petition for writ of mandate) filed by The Superior Court of San Diego.
Date: 2020-04-20T00:00:00Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail SD generated.
Date: 2020-07-28T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Status Conference (Civil) heard 07/10/2020 10:15:00 AM.
Date: 2020-07-10T00:00:00Notice of Intent to Appear Telephonically filed by Mehta, Preeti.
Date: 2020-07-02T00:00:00Notice - Other (Notice of Motion) filed by Alexander, Christopher.
Date: 2020-12-04T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Motion Hearing (Civil) heard 11/20/2020 11:00:00 AM.
Date: 2020-11-20T00:00:00Proof of Service filed by Scripps Memorial Hospital La Jolla.
Date: 2020-10-28T00:00:00Proof of Service filed by Scripps Memorial Hospital La Jolla.
Date: 2020-11-06T00:00:00Declaration - Other filed by Scripps Memorial Hospital La Jolla.
Date: 2020-11-06T00:00:00Opposition - Other (to Motion for Reconsideration) filed by Scripps Memorial Hospital La Jolla.
Date: 2022-01-21T00:00:00Motion for Protective Order submitted by Alexander, Christopher rejected on 10/01/2020.
Date: 2020-10-01T00:00:00Motion - Other (for Peremptory Challenge) filed by Alexander, Christopher.
Date: 2020-12-04T00:00:00Motion for Protective Order filed by Alexander, Christopher.
Date: 2020-09-28T00:00:00Proof of Service filed by Scripps Memorial Hospital La Jolla.
Date: 2022-01-05T00:00:00Writ of Execution Returned - Unsatisfied filed by Estate of Elizabeth Alexander.
Date: 2021-02-16T00:00:00Declaration - Other filed by Scripps Memorial Hospital La Jolla.
Date: 2022-01-05T00:00:00Order (Petition for Writ Denied) filed by The Superior Court of San Diego.
Date: 2020-09-30T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Ex Parte heard 01/06/2022 08:30:00 AM.
Date: 2022-01-06T00:00:00Declaration - Other filed by Scripps Memorial Hospital La Jolla.
Date: 2021-12-29T00:00:00Ex Parte Application - Other and Supporting Documents (for order to show cause) filed by Scripps Health.
Date: 2022-01-04T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Multiple Events heard 08/21/2020 11:00:00 AM.
Date: 2020-08-21T00:00:00Proof of Service filed by Scripps Memorial Hospital La Jolla.
Date: 2022-01-21T00:00:00Reply (plaintiff's reply to motion for a protective order) filed by Alexander, Christopher.
Date: 2020-11-17T00:00:00Proposed Order filed by Scripps Memorial Hospital La Jolla.
Date: 2020-11-06T00:00:00Opposition - Other filed by Scripps Memorial Hospital La Jolla.
Date: 2020-11-06T00:00:00Ex Parte Application - Other and Supporting Documents filed by Alexander, Christopher.
Date: 2022-01-25T00:00:00Order - Other (Order on Peremptory Challege)(GRANTED) filed by Alexander, Christopher.
Date: 2020-12-08T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail filed by Scripps Memorial Hospital La Jolla.
Date: 2021-12-29T00:00:00Proof of Service filed by Scripps Memorial Hospital La Jolla.
Date: 2020-08-24T00:00:00Motion - Other (for Reconsideration of Court's Protective Order) filed by Alexander, Christopher.
Date: 2020-12-04T00:00:00Case reassigned from Judge Trapp, Randa to Keri Katz effective 10/06/2021
Date: 2021-10-06T00:00:00Declaration - Other (of William M. Low) filed by Scripps Memorial Hospital La Jolla.
Date: 2022-01-21T00:00:00Motion for Sanctions filed by Scripps Health.
Date: 2021-10-15T00:00:00Notice of Hearing SD generated.
Date: 2022-01-06T00:00:00Proposed Order submitted by Alexander, Christopher received but not filed on 05/01/2023.
Date: 2023-05-01T00:00:00Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail SD generated.
Date: 2022-01-26T00:00:00Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed by Alexander, Christopher.
Date: 2022-09-26T00:00:00Declaration - Other filed by Alexander, Christopher.
Date: 2023-01-27T00:00:00Objections filed by Alexander, Christopher.
Date: 2022-09-26T00:00:00Reply filed by Alexander, Christopher.
Date: 2022-01-28T00:00:00Proof of Service filed by Scripps Health.
Date: 2023-02-03T00:00:00Proof of Service filed by Alexander, Christopher.
Date: 2022-01-28T00:00:00Notice of Ruling filed by Scripps Memorial Hospital La Jolla.
Date: 2022-02-07T00:00:00Proof of Service filed by Scripps Memorial Hospital La Jolla.
Date: 2022-02-07T00:00:00Notice of Default (RT Fees) filed by The Superior Court of San Diego.
Date: June 21, 2023Ex Parte Application for Stay filed by Alexander, Christopher.
Date: 2023-05-01T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Motion Hearing (Civil) heard 02/04/2022 08:30:00 AM.
Date: 2022-02-04T00:00:00Declaration - Other filed by Alexander, Christopher.
Date: 2022-01-28T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Ex Parte heard 01/26/2022 08:30:00 AM.
Date: 2022-01-26T00:00:00Ex Parte Application - Other and Supporting Documents filed by Scripps Memorial Hospital La Jolla.
Date: 2022-09-20T00:00:00Declaration - Other filed by Alexander, Christopher.
Date: 2022-09-26T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail filed by Alexander, Christopher.
Date: 2022-09-26T00:00:00Notice of Filing SD generated.
Date: June 21, 2023Proof of Service by Mail filed by Alexander, Christopher.
Date: 2023-05-01T00:00:00Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed by Alexander, Christopher.
Date: 2023-01-27T00:00:00Tentative Ruling for Motion Hearing (Civil) published.
Date: 2023-04-20T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail filed by Alexander, Christopher.
Date: May 04, 2023Reply to Opposition - Other filed by Scripps Health.
Date: 2023-02-03T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Motion Hearing (Civil) heard 02/10/2023 08:30:00 AM.
Date: 2023-02-10T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail filed by Alexander, Christopher.
Date: 2023-01-27T00:00:00Tentative Ruling for Motion Hearing (Civil) published.
Date: 2022-02-03T00:00:00Appellant's Notice Designating Record on Appeal filed by Alexander, Christopher.
Date: June 20, 2023Minutes finalized for Ex Parte heard 09/27/2022 08:30:00 AM.
Date: 2022-09-27T00:00:00Tentative Ruling for Motion Hearing (Civil) published.
Date: 2023-02-09T00:00:00Notice of Ruling filed by Scripps Memorial Hospital La Jolla.
Date: 2023-04-21T00:00:00Affidavit - Other filed by Scripps Health.
Date: 2023-02-03T00:00:00Notice of Ruling filed by Scripps Memorial Hospital La Jolla.
Date: 2023-01-10T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Ex Parte heard 05/03/2023 08:30:00 AM.
Date: May 03, 2023Demand for Jury Trial filed by Lugo MD, Gustavo A Jr.
Date: 2014-07-17T00:00:00Notice of Complex Case Designation SD generated.
Date: 2014-08-01T00:00:00Notice of Jury Fee Deposit (& Demand for Jury Demand) filed by Ritt, Donald.
Date: 2014-07-29T00:00:00Demurrer filed by Shieh, Marie.
Date: 2014-06-30T00:00:00Motion to Strike filed by Shieh, Marie.
Date: 2014-06-30T00:00:00Case initiation form printed.
Date: 2014-05-21T00:00:00Notice of Lodgment (IN SUPPORT OF DEMURRER) filed by Shieh, Marie.
Date: 2014-06-30T00:00:00Notice of Jury Fee Deposit filed by Lugo MD, Gustavo A Jr.
Date: 2014-07-17T00:00:00Demurrer submitted by Wiesner, Christopher rejected on 09/24/2014.
Date: 2014-09-24T00:00:00Demurrer filed by Mehta, Preeti.
Date: 2014-07-17T00:00:00Motion to Strike filed by Mehta, Preeti.
Date: 2014-07-17T00:00:00Notice of Lodgment (IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO STRIKE) filed by Shieh, Marie.
Date: 2014-06-30T00:00:00Demurrer filed by Wiesner MD, Christopher.
Date: 2014-09-24T00:00:00Demurrer (AND MOTION TO STRIKE) submitted by Ritt, Donald rejected on 09/25/2014.
Date: 2014-09-25T00:00:00Demurrer submitted by Lugo MD, Gustavo A Jr rejected on 09/24/2014.
Date: 2014-09-24T00:00:00Motion to Strike filed by Ritt MD, Donald.
Date: 2014-09-30T00:00:00Declaration - Other (of Robert W Frank) filed by Ritt MD, Donald.
Date: 2014-09-30T00:00:00Memorandum of Points and Authorities (in support of Demurrer of Donald Ritt) filed by Ritt MD, Donald.
Date: 2014-09-30T00:00:00Demurrer filed by Ritt MD, Donald.
Date: 2014-09-30T00:00:00Motion to Strike filed by Wiesner MD, Christopher.
Date: 2014-09-24T00:00:00Proof of Service (as to Demurrer of Donald Ritt) filed by Ritt MD, Donald.
Date: 2014-09-30T00:00:00Proof of Service (as to Donald Ritt MD's Motion to Strike) filed by Ritt MD, Donald.
Date: 2014-09-30T00:00:00Joinder to Motion and Supporting Declarations filed by Mehta, Preeti.
Date: 2014-10-27T00:00:00Ex Parte Application - Other and Supporting Documents filed by Ritt, Donald.
Date: 2014-12-01T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Ex Parte heard 10/09/2014 08:30:00 AM. (Subsequently amended - See ROA # 76)
Date: 2014-10-09T00:00:00Response (to Ex Parte Application) filed by Alexander, Clenton.
Date: 2014-10-08T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Ex Parte heard 10/29/2014 08:30:00 AM.
Date: 2014-10-29T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney filed by Alexander, Christopher.
Date: 2014-10-29T00:00:00Declaration - Other (to Continue Action in Support of Complaint) filed by Estate of Elizabeth Alexander.
Date: 2014-10-29T00:00:00Notice - Other (Notice of Limited Scope Representation) filed by Alexander, Christopher.
Date: 2014-10-29T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Ex Parte heard 10/09/2014 08:30:00 AM. (Subsequently amended - See ROA # 81)
Date: 2014-10-09T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Ex Parte heard 10/09/2014 08:30:00 AM. (As Amended)
Date: 2014-10-09T00:00:00Motion for Protective Order (AND SUPPORTING DOCUMENTS) filed by Ritt MD, Donald.
Date: 2014-10-14T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney filed by McDermet, Jacquelyn.
Date: 2014-10-29T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney filed by Alexander, Clenton.
Date: 2014-10-29T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Ex Parte heard 12/02/2014 08:30:00 AM.
Date: 2014-12-02T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail filed by Ritt, Donald.
Date: 2015-03-05T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed by Lugo, Gustavo.
Date: 2015-02-19T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail filed by Ritt, Donald.
Date: 2015-01-21T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed by SCRIPPS MEMORIAL HOSPITAL LA JOLLA.
Date: 2015-03-05T00:00:00Notice of Jury Fee Deposit filed by Mehta, Preeti.
Date: 2015-02-25T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed by Ritt, Donald.
Date: 2015-03-05T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed by Mehta, Preeti.
Date: 2015-02-25T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed by Wiesner, Christopher.
Date: 2015-02-20T00:00:00Original Summons filed by Alexander, Clenton; McDermet, Jacquelyn; Estate of Elizabeth Alexander.
Date: 2015-03-05T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed by Shieh, Marie.
Date: 2015-03-02T00:00:00Declaration - Other filed by Alexander, Christopher.
Date: 2023-05-01T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Motion Hearing (Civil) heard 04/21/2023 08:30:00 AM.
Date: 2023-04-21T00:00:00Notice of Ruling filed by Scripps Memorial Hospital La Jolla.
Date: 2023-02-14T00:00:00Reply filed by Mehta, Preeti.
Date: 2016-06-24T00:00:00Objections filed by Mehta, Preeti.
Date: 2016-06-24T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Summary Judgment / Summary Adjudication (Civil) heard 06/24/2016 11:00:00 AM.
Date: 2016-06-24T00:00:00Notice - Other (Notice of Entry of Order Granting Motion for Summary Judgment) filed by Ritt, Donald.
Date: 2016-07-05T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Multiple Events heard 07/01/2016 11:00:00 AM.
Date: 2016-07-01T00:00:00Proposed Order submitted by Lugo Jr MD, Gustavo received but not filed on 06/17/2016.
Date: 2016-06-17T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail filed by Ritt, Donald.
Date: 2016-08-11T00:00:00Memorandum of Costs (Summary) filed by Mehta, Preeti.
Date: 2016-08-10T00:00:00Memorandum of Costs (Summary) filed by Mehta, Preeti.
Date: 2016-08-15T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Judgment filed by Mehta, Preeti.
Date: 2016-08-04T00:00:00Reply to Opposition of Noticed Motion and Supporting Declarations filed by Shieh, Marie.
Date: 2016-06-24T00:00:00Memorandum of Costs (Summary) filed by Scripps Memorial Hospital La Jolla.
Date: 2016-07-27T00:00:00Memorandum of Costs (Summary) filed by Mehta, Preeti.
Date: 2016-08-11T00:00:00Judgment by Default by Court filed by Ritt, Donald.
Date: 2016-07-25T00:00:00Memorandum of Costs (Summary) filed by Ritt, Donald.
Date: 2016-08-11T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Judgment filed by Scripps Memorial Hospital La Jolla.
Date: 2016-07-27T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Judgment filed by Ritt, Donald.
Date: 2016-08-01T00:00:00Judgment (Motion for Summary Judgment) filed by Mehta, Preeti. Refers to: Estate of Elizabeth Alexander
Date: 2016-07-25T00:00:00Judgment (On Motion for Summary Judgment) filed by Scripps Memorial Hospital La Jolla.
Date: 2016-07-25T00:00:00Judgment (JUDGMENT IN FAVOR OF DEFENDANT MARIE SHIEH, M.D.) filed by Shieh, Marie.
Date: 2016-08-22T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Judgment filed by Lugo Jr MD, Gustavo A.
Date: 2016-08-23T00:00:00Memorandum of Costs (Summary) filed by Shieh, Marie.
Date: 2016-09-07T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Motion Hearing (Civil) heard 09/02/2016 11:00:00 AM.
Date: 2016-09-02T00:00:00Memorandum of Costs (Summary) filed by Lugo Jr MD, Gustavo A.
Date: 2016-08-26T00:00:00Memorandum of Costs (Summary) filed by Shieh, Marie.
Date: 2016-09-02T00:00:00[Another document for ROA# 412]
Date: 2016-08-29T00:00:00Proof of Service (personal service) filed by Pund, Ernest; Ettari, Charles.
Date: 2016-08-24T00:00:00Proof of Service (re personal service) filed by Pund, Ernest; Ettari, Charles.
Date: 2016-08-24T00:00:00Default vacated.
Date: 2016-10-18T00:00:00Notice of Default SD generated.
Date: 2016-09-13T00:00:00Opposition - Other filed by Mehta, Preeti.
Date: 2016-12-05T00:00:00Default vacated.
Date: 2016-09-28T00:00:00Notice of Lodgment filed by Ritt, Donald.
Date: 2016-12-05T00:00:00Opposition to Noticed Motion and Supporting Declarations filed by Ritt, Donald.
Date: 2016-12-05T00:00:00Default vacated.
Date: 2016-10-20T00:00:00Proof of Service filed by Mehta, Preeti.
Date: 2016-12-05T00:00:00[Another document for ROA# 454]
Date: 2016-12-30T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Multiple Events heard 12/16/2016 11:00:00 AM.
Date: 2016-12-16T00:00:00Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail SD generated.
Date: 2017-01-11T00:00:00Notice of Ruling (Re Plaintiffs' Motion to Stay, Strike, or Tax Costs) filed by Ritt, Donald.
Date: 2017-01-19T00:00:00Opposition to Noticed Motion and Supporting Declarations filed by Shieh, Marie.
Date: 2017-01-26T00:00:00Notice of Lodgment filed by Shieh, Marie.
Date: 2017-01-26T00:00:00Notice of Ruling filed by Lugo Jr MD, Gustavo A.
Date: 2017-01-24T00:00:00Motion to Strike filed by Alexander, Clenton; Estate of Elizabeth Alexander; McDermet, Jacquelyn.
Date: 2017-01-06T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Motion Hearing (Civil) heard 01/13/2017 11:00:00 AM.
Date: 2017-01-13T00:00:00Miscellaneous Minute Order Finalized.
Date: 2017-01-11T00:00:00Proof of Service filed by Ritt, Donald.
Date: 2017-01-19T00:00:00Proof of Service filed by Scripps Memorial Hospital La Jolla.
Date: 2017-01-17T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Judgment filed by Lugo Jr MD, Gustavo A.
Date: 2017-02-08T00:00:00Receipt of Reporter's Transcript (L. MASON THOMPSON) filed by The Superior Court of San Diego.
Date: 2017-02-06T00:00:00Receipt of Reporter's Transcript (R. SHOAFF) filed by The Superior Court of San Diego.
Date: 2017-02-06T00:00:00Judgment (AMENDED JUDGMENT IN FAVOR OF DEFENDANT DONALD RITT, MD) filed by Ritt, Donald.
Date: 2017-01-31T00:00:00Disbursement of Clerk's Trust Fund (FOR ALEXANDER) filed by The Superior Court of San Diego.
Date: 2017-02-06T00:00:00Receipt for Record on Appeal (D071001 COURT OF APPEAL) filed by The Superior Court of San Diego.
Date: 2017-02-02T00:00:00Receipt for Record on Appeal filed by The Superior Court of San Diego.
Date: 2017-02-01T00:00:00Receipt of Reporter's Transcript (L. ORELLANA) filed by The Superior Court of San Diego.
Date: 2017-02-06T00:00:00Disbursement of Clerk's Trust Fund (FOR SCRIPPS) filed by The Superior Court of San Diego.
Date: 2017-02-06T00:00:00Notice of Completion of the Record on Appeal SD generated.
Date: 2017-02-06T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Judgment (Amended Judgment) filed by Ritt, Donald.
Date: 2017-02-09T00:00:00Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (Minutes Only) SD generated.
Date: 2017-02-10T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Motion Hearing (Civil) heard 02/10/2017 11:00:00 AM.
Date: 2017-02-10T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Judgment filed by Scripps Memorial Hospital La Jolla.
Date: 2017-02-08T00:00:00Opposition to Noticed Motion and Supporting Declarations filed by Ritt, Donald.
Date: 2017-04-07T00:00:00[Another document for ROA# 509]
Date: 2017-04-06T00:00:00Receipt of Reporter's Transcript (J.Gallivan) filed by The Superior Court of San Diego.
Date: 2017-02-16T00:00:00Notice of Lodgment filed by Lugo Jr MD, Gustavo A.
Date: 2017-04-06T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail (Notice of Ruling; Amended Judgment) filed by Shieh, Marie.
Date: 2017-03-07T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Motion Hearing (Civil) heard 04/21/2017 11:00:00 AM.
Date: 2017-04-21T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Judgment filed by Mehta, Preeti.
Date: 2017-02-14T00:00:00Opposition to Noticed Motion and Supporting Declarations filed by Mehta, Preeti.
Date: 2017-04-10T00:00:00Notice of Lodgment filed by Ritt, Donald.
Date: 2017-04-07T00:00:00Notice of Ruling (Re Plaintiffs' Motion to Stay, Strike, or Tax Costs) filed by Shieh, Marie.
Date: 2017-03-07T00:00:00Remittitur filed by The Superior Court of San Diego.
Date: 2018-07-27T00:00:00Miscellaneous Minute Order Finalized.
Date: 2017-06-12T00:00:00Notice of Ruling filed by Ritt, Donald.
Date: 2017-04-21T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail filed by Ritt, Donald.
Date: 2017-04-21T00:00:00Remittitur filed by The Superior Court of San Diego.
Date: 2017-06-06T00:00:00Order (Court of Appeal Order) filed by The Superior Court of San Diego.
Date: 2018-05-11T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.