Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Nitelshpur, Mikhail, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case against Medina, Ricky, in the jurisdiction of San Diego County. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts with Jeffrey B. Barton presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJeffrey B. Barton Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateMarch 27, 2014 |
CategoryCivil - Unlimited |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions267 days |
Filing LocationSan Diego County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
|
Case Cycle Time1376 days |
Notice of Rescheduled Hearing SD generated.
Date: August 15, 2014Miscellaneous Minute Order Finalized.
Date: 2014-04-09T00:00:00Notice of Hearing SD generated.
Date: 2014-04-02T00:00:00Case reassigned from Judge Taylor, Timothy to Jeffrey Barton effective 04/14/2014
Date: 2014-04-14T00:00:00Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (Minutes Only) SD generated.
Date: 2014-04-09T00:00:00Order to Show Cause (Non-Sanctions) SD generated.
Date: 2014-08-15T00:00:00Notice of Hearing SD generated.
Date: 2014-04-15T00:00:00Declaration of Prejudice CCP 170.6 (Granted) filed by Nitelshpur, Mikhail.
Date: 2014-04-08T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Nitelshpur, Mikhail. Refers to: Medina, Ricky
Date: 2014-03-27T00:00:00Complaint filed by Nitelshpur, Mikhail. Refers to: Medina, Ricky
Date: 2014-03-27T00:00:00Order After Hearing generated.
Date: 2014-04-22T00:00:00Case initiation form printed.
Date: 2014-03-28T00:00:00Order on Court Fee Waiver (DENIED, HEARING SET) filed by Nitelshpur, Mikhail.
Date: 2014-03-28T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Fee Waiver Hearing (Civil) heard 04/22/2014 09:00:00 AM.
Date: 2014-04-22T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Civil Case Management Conference heard 08/15/2014 09:00:00 AM.
Date: 2014-08-15T00:00:00Notice of Rescheduled Hearing SD generated.
Date: November 14, 2014Minutes finalized for Multiple Events heard 10/03/2014 09:00:00 AM.
Date: October 03, 2014Order to Show Cause (Non-Sanctions) SD generated.
Date: October 03, 2014Minutes finalized for OSC - Why Case Should Not be Dismissed heard 11/14/2014 09:00:00 AM.
Date: November 14, 2014Minutes finalized for OSC - Why Case Should Not be Dismissed heard 12/19/2014 10:00:00 AM.
Date: December 19, 2014For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.