Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Citibank N A, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Lief, Amy, against Rapelo, Armin G, represented by Dorman, Jessica R K, in the jurisdiction of San Diego County. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts with Kenneth J Medel presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeKenneth J Medel Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateJanuary 30, 2014 |
CategoryCivil - Limited |
Time To Trial470 days |
Last RefreshedMay 14, 2022 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions2164 days |
Filing LocationSan Diego County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Cycle Time2402 days |
Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Citibank N A. Refers to: Rapelo, Armin
Date: 2014-01-30T00:00:00Complaint Demanding Less than $10,000 filed by Citibank N A. Refers to: Rapelo, Armin
Date: 2014-01-30T00:00:00Case Management Statement submitted by Citibank N A rejected on 05/08/2014.
Date: 2014-05-08T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed by Rapelo, Armin G.
Date: 2015-04-06T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Civil Case Management Conference heard 05/15/2015 08:30:00 AM.
Date: 2015-05-15T00:00:00Miscellaneous Minute Order Finalized.
Date: 2015-10-15T00:00:00Case reassigned from Judge Pressman, Joel M. to Kenneth Medel effective 12/27/2019
Date: 2019-12-27T00:00:00Declaration - Other filed by Citibank N A.
Date: 2014-10-14T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed by Citibank N A.
Date: 2015-04-03T00:00:00Case reassigned from C-07 to Joel Pressman effective 01/21/2015
Date: 2015-01-21T00:00:00Original Summons filed by Citibank N A. Refers to: Rapelo, Armin
Date: 2014-01-30T00:00:00Proposed Order submitted by Citibank N A received but not filed on 01/03/2020.
Date: 2020-01-03T00:00:00Case Management Statement submitted by Rapelo, Armin G rejected on 04/23/2014.
Date: 2014-04-23T00:00:00Notice of Conditional Settlement filed by Citibank N A. Refers to: Rapelo, Armin
Date: 2015-10-14T00:00:00Answer filed by Rapelo, Armin G.
Date: 2014-03-03T00:00:00Declaration - Other filed by Citibank N A. Refers to: Rapelo, Armin
Date: 2014-01-30T00:00:00Case initiation form printed.
Date: 2014-01-30T00:00:00Proof of Service filed by Citibank N A.
Date: 2014-04-02T00:00:00Stipulation - Other filed by Citibank N A.
Date: 2020-01-03T00:00:00Motion - Other (to vacate dismissal entered, enter judgment) filed by Citibank N A.
Date: 2020-01-03T00:00:00Notice of Dismissal by Court SD generated.
Date: 2015-10-15T00:00:00Notice - Other (of Continued Hearing on Motion) filed by Citibank N A.
Date: August 07, 2020Declaration - Other (re non active military status) filed by Citibank N A.
Date: 2020-01-03T00:00:00Notice - Other (Amended Notice of Continued Hearing on Motion) filed by Citibank N A.
Date: August 28, 2020Notice - Other (of Status Conference) filed by Citibank N A.
Date: 2020-06-19T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Motion Hearing (Civil) heard 08/21/2020 09:30:00 AM.
Date: August 21, 2020For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.