We are checking for the latest updates in this case. We will email you when the process is complete.
Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Jonathan Neil & Associates Inc ,
filed a(n)
Collections -
Creditor
case
represented by
Minassian, Natalia A ,
against
Bobileff Corporation ,
in the jurisdiction of San Diego County.
This case was filed in
San Diego County
Superior Courts
.
Filing Date
December 19, 2013
Last Refreshed
February 24, 2021
Filing Location
San Diego County, CA
Plaintiffs
Jonathan Neil & Associates Inc
Case Events for
Jonathan Neil & Associates Inc v. Bobileff Corporation
Date
Type
Description
March 26, 2014
Docket Event
Complaint Demanding Less than $10,000 dismissed with prejudice as to Bobileff Corporation.
March 26, 2014
Docket Event
Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action filed by Jonathan Neil & Associates Inc. Refers to: Bobileff Corporation
Get Document
March 26, 2014
Docket Event
Complaint Demanding Less than $10,000 dismissed with prejudice as to Jonathan Neil & Associates Inc.
January 21, 2014
Docket Event
Certificate of Service filed by Jonathan Neil & Associates Inc. Refers to: Bobileff Corporation
Get Document
January 16, 2014
Docket Event
Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Jonathan Neil & Associates Inc. Refers to: Bobileff Corporation
Get Document
December 20, 2013
Docket Event
Summons issued.
December 20, 2013
Docket Event
Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Collections SD Case initiation form printed.
Get Document
December 19, 2013
Docket Event
Complaint Demanding Less than $10,000 filed by Jonathan Neil & Associates Inc. Refers to: Bobileff Corporation
Get Document
December 19, 2013
Docket Event
Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Jonathan Neil & Associates Inc. Refers to: Bobileff Corporation
Get Document
December 19, 2013
Docket Event
Case assigned to Department C-06.
See all events
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.