Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Escoto, Miranda, filed a(n) General Employment - Labor and Employment case against Sweetwater Union High School District, represented by Creighton, Jennifer S, in the jurisdiction of San Diego County. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts with Richard E. L. Strauss presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateJune 14, 2013 |
CategoryCivil - Unlimited |
Time To Trial469 days |
Last RefreshedMay 13, 2022 |
Practice AreaLabor and Employment |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions216 days |
Filing LocationSan Diego County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Employment |
|
Case Cycle Time2362 days |
Case initiation form printed.
Date: 2013-06-17T00:00:00Demurrer (to second cause of action of complaint) filed by Sweetwater Union High School District.
Date: 2013-08-14T00:00:00Complaint filed by Escoto, Miranda. Refers to: Sweetwater Union High School District
Date: 2013-06-14T00:00:00Certificate of Service filed by Escoto, Miranda.
Date: 2013-07-23T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Escoto, Miranda. Refers to: Sweetwater Union High School District
Date: 2013-06-14T00:00:00Original Summons filed by Escoto, Miranda. Refers to: Sweetwater Union High School District
Date: 2013-06-14T00:00:00Notice of Lodgment filed by Sweetwater Union High School District.
Date: 2013-08-14T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice filed by Sweetwater Union High School District.
Date: 2013-08-14T00:00:00Notice of Rescheduled Hearing SD generated.
Date: 2014-01-31T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed by Sweetwater Union High School District.
Date: 2014-03-18T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed by Escoto, Miranda.
Date: 2014-03-24T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Civil Case Management Conference heard 04/04/2014 11:00:00 AM.
Date: 2014-04-04T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Multiple Events heard 09/26/2014 11:00:00 AM.
Date: 2014-09-26T00:00:00Answer filed by Sweetwater Union High School District.
Date: 2014-10-06T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Ex Parte heard 12/11/2014 08:30:00 AM. (Subsequently amended - See ROA # 81)
Date: 2014-12-11T00:00:00Ex Parte Application - Other and Supporting Documents filed by Sweetwater Union High School District.
Date: 2014-12-10T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Ex Parte heard 12/11/2014 08:30:00 AM. (As Amended)
Date: 2014-12-11T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Civil Case Management Conference heard 09/26/2014 11:00:00 AM.
Date: 2014-09-26T00:00:00Notice of Rescheduled Hearing SD generated.
Date: 2015-02-25T00:00:00Ex Parte Application - Other and Supporting Documents filed by Sweetwater Union High School District.
Date: 2015-02-23T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Ex Parte heard 02/25/2015 08:30:00 AM.
Date: 2015-02-25T00:00:00The Civil Jury Trial was rescheduled to 08/21/2015 at 08:45:00 AM in C-70 before Randa Trapp at Central.
Date: 2015-05-16T00:00:00Settlement Conference (Civil) scheduled for 07/31/2015 at 10:30:00 AM at Central in C-33 Jay M. Bloom.
Date: 2015-07-27T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Settlement Conference (Civil) heard 07/31/2015 10:30:00 AM.
Date: 2015-07-31T00:00:00Advance Trial Review Order filed by Escoto, Miranda; Sweetwater Union High School District.
Date: 2015-07-31T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Trial Readiness Conference (Civil) heard 07/31/2015 09:00:00 AM.
Date: 2015-07-31T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Ex Parte heard 08/06/2015 08:15:00 AM.
Date: 2015-08-06T00:00:00Ex Parte Application - Other and Supporting Documents filed by Escoto, Miranda.
Date: 2015-08-05T00:00:00Trial Brief filed by Sweetwater Union High School District.
Date: 2015-08-14T00:00:00Ex Parte Application - Other and Supporting Documents filed by Sweetwater Union High School District.
Date: 2015-09-22T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Civil Jury Trial heard 08/21/2015 08:45:00 AM.
Date: 2015-08-21T00:00:00Joint Trial Readiness Conference Report filed by Escoto, Miranda; Sweetwater Union High School District.
Date: 2015-07-31T00:00:00Notice - Other (NOTICE OF OPPOSITION AND NON-OPPOSITION TO MOTIONS IN LIMINE) filed by Escoto, Miranda.
Date: 2015-08-19T00:00:00Trial Brief filed by Escoto, Miranda.
Date: 2015-09-10T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Ex Parte heard 09/24/2015 08:30:00 AM.
Date: 2015-09-24T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed by Sweetwater Union High School District.
Date: 2015-10-22T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Civil Case Management Conference heard 11/06/2015 10:45:00 AM.
Date: 2015-11-06T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Civil Jury Trial heard 10/02/2015 08:45:00 AM.
Date: 2015-10-02T00:00:00Case reassigned from Judge Trapp, Randa to Richard Strauss effective 10/05/2015
Date: 2015-10-05T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Civil Jury Trial heard 10/05/2015 09:00:00 AM.
Date: 2015-10-05T00:00:00Declaration of Prejudice CCP 170.1 (Motion for Recusal) filed by Escoto, Miranda.
Date: 2015-10-05T00:00:00Notice - Other (Notice of Withdrawl of Motion to Amend Complaint) filed by Escoto, Miranda.
Date: 2015-09-23T00:00:00Opposition to Noticed Motion and Supporting Declarations filed by Sweetwater Union High School District.
Date: 2015-09-22T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Ex Parte heard 03/02/2016 09:00:00 AM.
Date: 2016-03-02T00:00:00Settlement Conference (Civil) scheduled for 03/03/2017 at 01:30:00 PM at Central in C-65 Joan M. Lewis.
Date: 2017-01-20T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Multiple Events heard 07/01/2016 09:00:00 AM.
Date: 2016-07-01T00:00:00Opposition to Noticed Motion and Supporting Declarations (to MSJ) filed by Escoto, Miranda.
Date: 2016-06-10T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Ex Parte heard 05/05/2016 09:00:00 AM.
Date: 2016-05-05T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Multiple Events heard 01/20/2017 08:55:00 AM.
Date: 2017-01-20T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Multiple Events heard 06/24/2016 09:00:00 AM. (As Amended)
Date: 2016-06-24T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Trial Readiness Conference (Civil) heard 08/04/2017 08:55:00 AM.
Date: 2017-08-04T00:00:00Motion in Limine (#12 of 12) filed by Sweetwater Union High School District. Refers to: Escoto, Miranda
Date: 2017-04-28T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Ex Parte heard 08/08/2017 09:00:00 AM.
Date: 2017-08-08T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed by Sweetwater Union High School District.
Date: 2013-12-17T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed by Escoto, Miranda.
Date: 2013-12-19T00:00:00Notice of Jury Fee Deposit filed by Sweetwater Union High School District.
Date: 2013-12-16T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Demurrer / Motion to Strike heard 01/31/2014 11:00:00 AM.
Date: 2014-01-31T00:00:00Notice of Jury Fee Deposit filed by Escoto, Miranda.
Date: 2013-12-20T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Civil Case Management Conference heard 01/31/2014 11:00:00 AM.
Date: 2014-01-31T00:00:00Amended Complaint filed by Escoto, Miranda. Refers to: Sweetwater Union High School District
Date: 2014-02-19T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Status Conference (Civil) heard 02/02/2018 09:45:00 AM.
Date: 2018-02-02T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Motion Hearing (Civil) heard 09/22/2017 09:00:00 AM.
Date: 2017-09-22T00:00:00Advance Trial Review Order filed by Escoto, Miranda; Sweetwater Union High School District.
Date: 2017-04-21T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Settlement Conference (Civil) heard 03/08/2017 09:00:00 AM.
Date: 2017-03-08T00:00:00Order (Court of Appeal Order) filed by The Superior Court of San Diego.
Date: 2017-10-24T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Ex Parte heard 05/24/2018 09:00:00 AM.
Date: 2018-05-24T00:00:00Brief - Other (Supplemental Briefing Re Dismissal) filed by Sweetwater Union High School District.
Date: 2017-08-15T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Civil Jury Trial heard 05/05/2017 08:50:00 AM.
Date: 2017-05-05T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Trial Readiness Conference (Civil) heard 04/21/2017 08:55:00 AM.
Date: 2017-04-21T00:00:00Miscellaneous Minute Order Finalized.
Date: 2017-08-14T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Settlement Conference (Civil) heard 03/03/2017 01:30:00 PM. (As Amended)
Date: 2017-03-03T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Civil Jury Trial heard 08/15/2017 09:00:00 AM.
Date: 2017-08-15T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Civil Jury Trial heard 08/14/2017 09:00:00 AM.
Date: 2017-08-14T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Status Conference (Civil) heard 11/17/2017 09:45:00 AM.
Date: 2017-11-17T00:00:00Notice of Hearing SD generated.
Date: 2018-07-12T00:00:00Notice of Dismissal by Court SD generated.
Date: 2018-08-10T00:00:00Notice of Dismissal by Court SD generated.
Date: 2018-09-18T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Motion Hearing (Civil) heard 10/19/2018 09:00:00 AM.
Date: 2018-10-19T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Ex Parte heard 07/12/2018 09:00:00 AM.
Date: 2018-07-12T00:00:00Notice of Lien filed by Sweetwater Union High School District.
Date: May 01, 2019Minutes finalized for Ex Parte heard 02/07/2019 09:00:00 AM.
Date: 2019-02-07T00:00:00Miscellaneous Minute Order Finalized.
Date: 2018-08-10T00:00:00Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel of Record filed by Escoto, Miranda.
Date: 2018-09-24T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Motion Hearing (Civil) heard 08/10/2018 09:00:00 AM.
Date: 2018-08-10T00:00:00Notice of Dismissal by Court SD generated.
Date: 2018-10-29T00:00:00Application and Order Correcting Court Record filed by The Superior Court of San Diego.
Date: February 26, 2019Declaration - Other (Sign-In Sheet) filed by Escoto, Miranda.
Date: 2018-10-19T00:00:00Judgment of Dismissal filed by Sweetwater Union High School District. Refers to: Escoto, Miranda
Date: February 14, 2019Abstract of Judgment issued.
Date: December 02, 2019Memorandum of Costs (Summary) filed by Sweetwater Union High School District. Refers to: Escoto, Miranda
Date: 2019-02-13T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Ex Parte heard 02/14/2019 09:00:00 AM.
Date: 2019-02-14T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.