We are checking for the latest updates in this case. We will email you when the process is complete.
Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Wells Fargo Bank N A ,
filed a(n)
Collections -
Creditor
case
represented by
Mukai, Jeffrey ,
against
Frearson, Scott ,
in the jurisdiction of San Diego County.
This case was filed in
San Diego County
Superior Courts
.
Filing Date
April 29, 2013
Last Refreshed
February 23, 2021
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions
67 days
Filing Location
San Diego County, CA
Case Events for
Wells Fargo Bank N A v. Frearson, Scott
Date
Type
Description
July 25, 2013
Docket Event
Complaint Demanding More than $10,000 but less than $25,000 dismissed without prejudice as to Frearson, Scott .
July 25, 2013
Docket Event
Complaint Demanding More than $10,000 but less than $25,000 dismissed without prejudice as to Wells Fargo Bank N A.
July 25, 2013
Docket Event
Request for Dismissal without Prejudice - Entire Action filed by Wells Fargo Bank N A.
Get Document
July 05, 2013
Docket Event
********Default Received********
July 05, 2013
Docket Event
Request for Entry of Default filed by Wells Fargo Bank N A. Refers to: Frearson, Scott
Get Document
July 05, 2013
Docket Event
Default entered as to Frearson, Scott on Complaint Demanding More than $10,000 but less than $25,000 filed by Wells Fargo Bank N A .
May 24, 2013
Docket Event
Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Wells Fargo Bank N A. Refers to: Frearson, Scott
Get Document
April 30, 2013
Docket Event
Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Collections SD Case initiation form printed.
Get Document
April 30, 2013
Docket Event
Summons issued.
April 29, 2013
Docket Event
Original Summons filed by Wells Fargo Bank N A. Refers to: Frearson, Scott
Get Document
See all events
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.