Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Buisan, David, filed a(n) Unlawful Detainer - Property case against Monahan, Anzhelika ; Aka : Monahan, Angelika, in the jurisdiction of San Diego County. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
||
Filing DateApril 29, 2013 |
CategoryCivil - Limited |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions52 days |
Filing LocationSan Diego County, CA |
Matter TypeUnlawful Detainer |
|
Case Cycle Time1708 days |
Complaint Demanding Less than $10,000 filed by Buisan, David. Refers to: Monahan, Anzhelika
Date: 2013-04-29T00:00:00Case initiation form printed.
Date: 2013-04-30T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Buisan, David. Refers to: Monahan, Anzhelika
Date: 2013-04-29T00:00:00Order on Court Fee Waiver filed by Buisan, David.
Date: 2013-05-07T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Fee Waiver Hearing (Civil) heard 05/20/2013 08:20:00 AM.
Date: 2013-05-20T00:00:00Order, Stipulation and Oath for Temporary Judge signed and filed.
Date: July 30, 2013Request for Entry of Default filed by Buisan, David. Refers to: Monahan, Anzhelika
Date: 2013-06-10T00:00:00Answer filed by Monahan, Anzhelika.
Date: 2013-06-10T00:00:00Order on Court Fee Waiver (GRANTED IN WHOLE) filed by Monahan, Anzhelika.
Date: 2013-06-11T00:00:00Unlawful Detainer Court Trial scheduled for 07/30/2013 at 08:30:00 AM at Central in C-07 .
Date: 2013-07-15T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.