Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Meriwest Credit Union, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Oto, Mark K, against Moore, William K, in the jurisdiction of San Diego County. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts with Joel R. Wohlfeil presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 29, 2013 |
CategoryCivil - Unlimited |
Last RefreshedFebruary 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationSan Diego County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Case Cycle Time276 days |
Original Summons filed by Meriwest Credit Union. Refers to: Moore, William
Date: 2013-04-29T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Meriwest Credit Union. Refers to: Moore, William
Date: 2013-04-29T00:00:00Complaint filed by Meriwest Credit Union. Refers to: Moore, William
Date: 2013-04-29T00:00:00Case initiation form printed.
Date: 2013-04-30T00:00:00Case reassigned from Denton,Steven to Wohlfeil,Joel effective 06/21/2013
Date: 2013-06-21T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed by Meriwest Credit Union.
Date: 2013-11-08T00:00:00Notice of Rescheduled Hearing SD generated.
Date: November 22, 2013Minutes finalized for Civil Case Management Conference heard 11/22/2013 10:50:00 AM.
Date: November 22, 2013Returned Mail (notice of case reassignment) filed by The Superior Court of San Diego.
Date: 2013-07-25T00:00:00Request for Dismissal without Prejudice - Entire Action filed by Meriwest Credit Union.
Date: January 07, 2014Miscellaneous Minute Order Finalized.
Date: January 30, 2014Notice of Hearing SD generated.
Date: 2013-11-22T00:00:00Notice of Dismissal by Court SD generated.
Date: January 30, 2014For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.