Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Hameed, Shahid Shawn, Magnolia Business Associates Llc, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Ozols, Dana Leigh; Von Esch, Robert Alexander Iv, against Dfo Llc, represented by Davis, Calvin E, in the jurisdiction of San Diego County. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts with Joan M. Lewis presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateApril 29, 2013 |
CategoryCivil - Unlimited |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions163 days |
Filing LocationSan Diego County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
|
Case Cycle Time324 days |
Complaint filed by Hameed, Shahid Shawn; Magnolia Business Associates LLC. Refers to: DFO Inc
Date: 2013-04-29T00:00:00Original Summons filed by Hameed, Shahid Shawn; Magnolia Business Associates LLC. Refers to: DFO LLC
Date: 2013-05-07T00:00:00Notice of Rescheduled Hearing SD generated.
Date: 2013-10-24T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed by Hameed, Shahid Shawn; Magnolia Business Associates LLC.
Date: 2013-10-07T00:00:00Notice of Jury Fee Deposit filed by DFO LLC.
Date: 2013-10-03T00:00:00Notice of Jury Fee Deposit filed by Hameed, Shahid Shawn; Magnolia Business Associates LLC.
Date: 2013-10-16T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed by DFO LLC.
Date: 2013-10-03T00:00:00Demurrer filed by DFO LLC.
Date: 2013-06-10T00:00:00Motion to Strike filed by DFO LLC.
Date: 2013-06-20T00:00:00Amended Complaint submitted by Hameed, Shahid Shawn rejected on 05/10/2013.
Date: 2013-05-10T00:00:00Original Summons filed by Hameed, Shahid Shawn; Magnolia Business Associates LLC. Refers to: DFO Inc
Date: 2013-04-29T00:00:00Reply to Opposition of Noticed Motion and Supporting Declarations (Motion to Strike) filed by DFO LLC.
Date: 2013-10-04T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Multiple Events heard 10/24/2013 08:30:00 AM.
Date: 2013-10-24T00:00:00Motion to Strike submitted by DFO LLC rejected on 06/14/2013.
Date: 2013-06-14T00:00:00Opposition to Noticed Motion and Supporting Declarations (Demurrer) filed by Hameed, Shahid Shawn.
Date: 2013-09-27T00:00:00Case initiation form printed.
Date: 2013-04-30T00:00:00Reply to Opposition of Noticed Motion and Supporting Declarations (Demurrer) filed by DFO LLC.
Date: 2013-10-04T00:00:00Original Summons filed by Hameed, Shahid Shawn; Magnolia Business Associates LLC. Refers to: DFO LLC
Date: 2013-05-06T00:00:00Returned Mail filed by The Superior Court of San Diego.
Date: 2013-11-05T00:00:00Proof of Service filed by DFO LLC.
Date: 2014-02-20T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Civil Case Management Conference heard 12/13/2013 10:15:00 AM.
Date: 2013-12-13T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed by Hameed, Shahid Shawn; Magnolia Business Associates LLC.
Date: 2013-11-27T00:00:00Notice of Change of Firm Name filed by Hameed, Shahid Shawn; Magnolia Business Associates LLC.
Date: 2014-02-07T00:00:00Motion to Strike (MOTION TO STRIKE AGAINST PLAINTIFFS' SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT) filed by DFO LLC.
Date: 2013-12-12T00:00:00Order - Other submitted by DFO LLC received but not filed on 02/20/2014.
Date: 2014-02-20T00:00:00Demurrer (DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFFS' SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT) filed by DFO LLC.
Date: 2013-12-12T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.