Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Valdez, Emilio H, filed a(n) Civil - Unlimited case in the jurisdiction of San Diego County. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts with Kevin A. Enright presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 26, 2013 |
CategoryCivil - Unlimited |
Last RefreshedFebruary 23, 2021 |
|
Filing LocationSan Diego County, CA |
|
Case Cycle Time1561 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 04, 2017 | Docket Event | Petition for Withdrawal of Funds From Blocked Account filed by Emilio Valdez was granted. | |
August 04, 2017 | Docket Event | Minutes finalized for Ex Parte heard 08/04/2017 11:30:00 AM. | |
August 04, 2017 | Docket Event | Order for Withdrawal of Funds from Blocked Acct. filed by Valdez, Emilio H. | |
July 24, 2017 | Docket Event | Petition for Withdrawal of Funds From Blocked Account filed by Valdez, Emilio H. | |
July 24, 2017 | Docket Event | Ex Parte scheduled for 08/04/2017 at 11:30:00 AM at Central in C-74 Kevin A. Enright. | |
June 17, 2013 | Docket Event | Receipt and Acknowledgment of Order for the Deposit of Money into Blocked Account filed by Valdez, Emilio; Valdez, Hugo. | |
June 17, 2013 | Docket Event | Proof of Service filed by Valdez, Emilio; Valdez, Hugo. | |
May 31, 2013 | Docket Event | Order Approving Compromise of Claim of Minor or Adult Person with Disability filed by Valdez, Hugo; Valdez, Emilio. | |
May 31, 2013 | Docket Event | Petition to Approve Compromise of Claim of Minor or Adult Person with Disability filed by Hugo Valdez was granted. | |
May 31, 2013 | Docket Event | Minutes finalized for Hearing on Compromise of Claim heard 05/31/2013 09:45:00 AM. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.