Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Alonso, Jorge filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case in the jurisdiction of San Diego County. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts with Timothy M. Casserly presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 29, 2013 |
CategoryCivil - Unlimited |
Last RefreshedFebruary 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSan Diego County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
Case Cycle Time210 days |
Complaint filed by Rosales, Gabriel. Refers to: Alonso, Jorge
Date: 2013-04-29T00:00:00Cross-Complaint filed by Alonso, Jorge. Refers to: Rosales, Gabriel
Date: June 20, 2013Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action filed by Rosales, Gabriel.
Date: November 15, 2013Certificate of Service filed by Rosales, Gabriel.
Date: 2013-05-13T00:00:00Original Summons filed by Rosales, Gabriel. Refers to: Alonso, Jorge
Date: 2013-04-29T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment SD generated.
Date: 2013-04-29T00:00:00Answer filed by Alonso, Jorge. Refers to: Rosales, Gabriel
Date: 2013-06-20T00:00:00Original Summons filed by Alonso, Jorge. Refers to: Rosales, Gabriel
Date: 2013-06-20T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Rosales, Gabriel. Refers to: Alonso, Jorge
Date: 2013-04-29T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default filed by Alonso, Jorge. Refers to: Rosales, Gabriel
Date: September 04, 2013For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.