Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Griffith, Edward C, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Roseman, Charles S, against Daniel, David Clark, in the jurisdiction of San Diego County. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts with Ronald S. Prager presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 26, 2013 |
CategoryCivil - Unlimited |
Last RefreshedFebruary 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSan Diego County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Case Cycle Time202 days |
Proof of Service by Mail filed by GRIFFITH, EDWARD C.
Date: November 13, 2013Minutes finalized for Civil Case Management Conference heard 10/02/2013 01:15:00 PM.
Date: October 02, 2013Case initiation form printed.
Date: 2013-04-29T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by GRIFFITH, EDWARD C. Refers to: Daniel, David
Date: 2013-04-26T00:00:00Complaint filed by GRIFFITH, EDWARD C. Refers to: Daniel, David
Date: 2013-04-26T00:00:00Original Summons filed by GRIFFITH, EDWARD C. Refers to: Daniel, David
Date: 2013-04-26T00:00:00Declaration - Other (of Richared D Prager) filed by GRIFFITH, EDWARD C.
Date: 2013-10-02T00:00:00Notice of Rescheduled Hearing SD generated.
Date: 2013-10-02T00:00:00Miscellaneous Minute Order Finalized.
Date: October 29, 2013Notice of Dismissal by Court SD generated.
Date: October 29, 2013Case Management Statement filed by GRIFFITH, EDWARD C.
Date: 2013-09-25T00:00:00Order for Publication of Summons/Citation filed by GRIFFITH, EDWARD C.
Date: October 08, 2013For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.