Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
Homeowner's Association of the Solana Beach & Tennis Club vs. City of Solana Beach
On April 26, 2013 a writ of mandate case was filed by (Subcribe to view) in the jurisdiction of San Diego County. Judge Timothy M. Casserly presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
April 26, 2013
Last Refreshed
May 13, 2022
Filing Location
San Diego County, CA
OTHER JUDGES ON THIS CASE
Robert P Dahlquist;OTHER JUDGES ON THIS CASE
Parties
Plaintiffs
Other Parties
Case Documents
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 29, 2019 | Docket Event | Amended Petition dismissed with prejudice as to Del Mar Beach Club Owner's Association. | |
March 29, 2019 | Docket Event | Amended Petition dismissed with prejudice as to Surfsong Owner's Association. | |
March 29, 2019 | Docket Event | Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action filed by Homeowner's Association of the Solana Beach & Tennis Club. |
|
March 29, 2019 | Docket Event | Amended Petition dismissed with prejudice as to Del Mar Shores Terrace Homeowner's Association. | |
March 29, 2019 | Docket Event | Amended Petition dismissed with prejudice as to Homeowner's Association of the Solana Beach & Tennis Club. | |
March 29, 2019 | Docket Event | Amended Petition dismissed with prejudice as to City of Solana Beach. | |
March 29, 2019 | Docket Event | Amended Petition dismissed with prejudice as to Seascape Chateau Condominium Association. | |
March 29, 2019 | Docket Event | Amended Petition dismissed with prejudice as to Seascape Shores Management Corporation. | |
March 29, 2019 | Docket Event | Amended Petition dismissed with prejudice as to Seascape Surf Management Corporation. | |
February 22, 2019 | Docket Event |
Notice of Case Reassignment SD Case reassigned from N-26 to N-31 effective 02/22/2019. |
|
February 16, 2019 | Docket Event |
Notice of Case Reassignment SD Case reassigned from N-29 to N-26 effective 02/16/2019. |
|
January 08, 2019 | Docket Event | Remittitur filed by The Superior Court of San Diego. |
|
January 08, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice of Appeal dismissed without prejudice as to California Coastal Commission. | |
January 08, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice of Appeal dismissed without prejudice as to City of Solana Beach. | |
January 08, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice of Appeal dismissed without prejudice as to Homeowner's Association of the Solana Beach & Tennis Club. | |
August 01, 2017 | Docket Event | Receipt for Record on Appeal filed by The Superior Court of San Diego. |
|
July 28, 2017 | Docket Event | Order (Court of Appeal order) filed by The Superior Court of San Diego. |
|
July 26, 2017 | Docket Event | Receipt for Record on Appeal filed by The Superior Court of San Diego. |
|
July 26, 2017 | Docket Event | Notice of Completion of the Record on Appeal SD generated. |
|
July 03, 2017 | Docket Event | Notice of Filing filed by The Superior Court of San Diego. |
|
June 20, 2017 | Docket Event | Declaration - Other (Return to Peremptory Writ of Mandate) filed by City of Solana Beach. |
|
June 13, 2017 | Docket Event |
California Coastal Commission's Return to Peremptory Writ of Mandate Notice - Other (Return to Peremptory Writ of Mandate) filed by California Coastal Commission. |
|
June 06, 2017 | Docket Event |
Notice of Designation of Record on Appeal and Election to Proceed by Appendix and Reporter's Transcript [Another document for ROA# 133] |
|
June 01, 2017 | Docket Event | Notice of Appeal filed by City of Solana Beach. Refers to: Homeowner's Association of the Solana Beach & Tennis Club |
|
June 01, 2017 | Docket Event |
Letter RE Election to Proceed SD Notice of Designation of Record on Appeal and Election to Proceed by Appendix and Reporter's Transcript filed by City of Solana Beach. Refers to: Homeowner's Association of the Solana Beach & Tennis Club |
|
June 01, 2017 | Docket Event |
Notice of Designation of Record on Appeal and Election to Proceed by Appendix and Reporter's Transcript [Another document for ROA# 137] |
|
May 31, 2017 | Docket Event | Notice of Appeal filed by California Coastal Commission. Refers to: City of Solana Beach |
|
May 01, 2017 | Docket Event | Notice of Entry of Judgment filed by City of Solana Beach. |
|
May 01, 2017 | Docket Event | Substitution of Attorney filed by City of Solana Beach. |
|
May 01, 2017 | Docket Event | Notice - Other (OF PEREMPTORY WRIT OF MANDATE) filed by City of Solana Beach. |
|
April 05, 2017 | Docket Event | Correspondence (PEREMPTORY WRIT OF MANDATE) filed by Homeowner's Association of the Solana Beach & Tennis Club. |
|
April 05, 2017 | Docket Event | Correspondence (PEREMPTORY WRIT OF MANDATE) filed by Del Mar Beach Club Owner's Association. | |
April 05, 2017 | Docket Event | Judgment filed by Homeowner's Association of the Solana Beach & Tennis Club. |
|
March 07, 2017 | Docket Event |
Notice of Confirmation of Filing SD E-filing transaction partially accepted. |
|
February 28, 2017 | Docket Event |
Notice of Lodging of [Proposed] Judgment Granting Peremptory Writ and [Proposed] Writ of Mandate Notice of Lodgment filed by City of Solana Beach. |
|
January 05, 2017 | Docket Event | Notice of Change of Firm Name filed by Del Mar Beach Club Owner's Association; Del Mar Shores Terrace Homeowner's Association; Homeowner's Association of the Solana Beach & Tennis Club; Seascape Chateau Condominium Association; Seascape Shores Management Corporation; Seascape Surf Management Corporation; Surfsong Owner's Association. |
|
December 06, 2016 | Docket Event | Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (Minutes Only) SD generated. |
|
December 06, 2016 | Docket Event | Matter decided. | |
December 06, 2016 | Docket Event |
Minute Order Miscellaneous Minute Order Finalized. |
|
November 18, 2016 | Docket Event |
Minute Order Minutes finalized for Motion Hearing (Civil) heard 11/18/2016 01:30:00 PM. |
|
November 18, 2016 | Docket Event | Appointment of Official Reporter Pro Tempore (STEPHANIE WHITEHEAD) filed by The Superior Court of San Diego. |
|
November 18, 2016 | Docket Event | Matter taken under submission. | |
November 17, 2016 | Docket Event | Tentative Ruling for Motion Hearing (Civil) published. | |
November 17, 2016 | Tentative Ruling | The Court issues the following ruling on Petitioners motion for judgment on their petition for writ of mandate: Petitioners Homeowners Association of the Solana Beach k Tennis Club, et al (Petitioner...
Judge: Timothy M. Casserly |
|
October 06, 2016 | Docket Event | Reply to Opposition of Noticed Motion and Supporting Declarations filed by Del Mar Beach Club Owner's Association; Del Mar Shores Terrace Homeowner's Association; Homeowner's Association of the Solana Beach & Tennis Club; Seascape Chateau Condominium Association; Seascape Shores Management Corporation; Seascape Surf Management Corporation; Surfsong Owner's Association. |
|
October 03, 2016 | Docket Event | Request for Judicial Notice filed by City of Solana Beach. |
|
September 30, 2016 | Docket Event |
Objections [Another document for ROA# 110] |
|
September 30, 2016 | Docket Event |
Intervenor California Coastal Commission's Opposition to Motion for Judgment on Petition for Writ of Mandate Opposition - Other (11/18/16) filed by California Coastal Commission. |
|
September 30, 2016 | Docket Event | Objections (11/18/16) filed by City of Solana Beach. |
|
September 30, 2016 | Docket Event | Opposition - Other (11/18/16) filed by City of Solana Beach. |
|
September 15, 2016 | Docket Event |
Notice of Motion for Judgment on Petition for Writ of Mandate Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings (11/18/2016) filed by Del Mar Beach Club Owner's Association; Del Mar Shores Terrace Homeowner's Association; Homeowner's Association of the Solana Beach & Tennis Club; Seascape Chateau Condominium Association; Seascape Shores Management Corporation; Seascape Surf Management Corporation; Surfsong Owner's Association. |
|
September 15, 2016 | Docket Event |
Request for Judicial Notice in Support of Motion for Judgment on Petition for Writ of Mandate Request for Judicial Notice (11/18/2016) filed by Del Mar Beach Club Owner's Association; Del Mar Shores Terrace Homeowner's Association; Homeowner's Association of the Solana Beach & Tennis Club; Seascape Chateau Condominium Association; Seascape Shores Management Corporation; Seascape Surf Management Corporation; Surfsong Owner's Association. |
|
September 15, 2016 | Docket Event |
Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Motion for Judgment on Petition for Writ of Mandate Memorandum of Points and Authorities (11/18/2016) filed by Del Mar Beach Club Owner's Association; Del Mar Shores Terrace Homeowner's Association; Homeowner's Association of the Solana Beach & Tennis Club; Seascape Chateau Condominium Association; Seascape Shores Management Corporation; Seascape Surf Management Corporation; Surfsong Owner's Association. |
|
August 15, 2016 | Docket Event |
Stipulation to Proceed with Petition for Writ of Mandate and Complaint for Declaratory Relief Combined in One Proceeding; Hearing Date Stipulation - Other (TO PROCEED WITH Petition for Writ of Mandate) filed by California Coastal Commission. |
|
July 20, 2016 | Docket Event | Motion Hearing (Civil) scheduled for 11/18/2016 at 01:30:00 PM at North County in N-31 Timothy M. Casserly. | |
July 08, 2016 | Docket Event |
Minute Order Minutes finalized for Motion Hearing (Civil) heard 07/08/2016 01:30:00 PM. |
|
July 08, 2016 | Docket Event | Appointment of Official Reporter Pro Tempore (LEYLA JONES #12750) filed by The Superior Court of San Diego. |
|
July 07, 2016 | Docket Event | Tentative Ruling for Motion Hearing (Civil) published. | |
June 17, 2016 | Docket Event | Motion Hearing (Civil) scheduled for 07/08/2016 at 01:30:00 PM at North County in N-31 Timothy M. Casserly. | |
June 17, 2016 | Docket Event | The Motion Hearing (Civil) was rescheduled to 07/08/2016 at 01:30:00 PM in N-31 before Timothy M. Casserly at North County. | |
June 16, 2016 | Docket Event |
Notice of Change of Contact Information Notice of Change of Address / Telephone Number filed by California Coastal Commission. |
|
June 16, 2016 | Docket Event | Tentative Ruling for Motion Hearing (Civil) published. | |
June 08, 2016 | Docket Event | Reply to Opposition - Other filed by Del Mar Beach Club Owner's Association; Del Mar Shores Terrace Homeowner's Association; Homeowner's Association of the Solana Beach & Tennis Club; Seascape Chateau Condominium Association; Seascape Shores Management Corporation; Seascape Surf Management Corporation; Surfsong Owner's Association. |
|
June 01, 2016 | Docket Event | Stipulation - Other - Fee Due (ORDER ALLOWING REPLY BRIEFS UP TO 15 PAGES IN LENGTH) filed by Homeowner's Association of the Solana Beach & Tennis Club. |
|
May 18, 2016 | Docket Event | Opposition - Other (06/17/16) filed by City of Solana Beach. |
|
May 18, 2016 | Docket Event | Request for Judicial Notice (06/17/16) filed by City of Solana Beach. |
|
May 18, 2016 | Docket Event |
Intervenor's Opposition to Petitioner's Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings/Petition Opposition - Other (06/17/2016) filed by California Coastal Commission. |
|
May 18, 2016 | Docket Event | Objections (06/17/16) filed by City of Solana Beach. |
|
May 18, 2016 | Docket Event |
Amended Declaration of Service by Overnight Courier Proof of Service filed by California Coastal Commission. |
|
March 24, 2016 | Docket Event | Stipulation - Other (TO CONTINUE JOP SET FOR 3/25/16 TO 6/17/16) filed by Homeowner's Association of the Solana Beach & Tennis Club. |
|
March 14, 2016 | Docket Event | Motion Hearing (Civil) scheduled for 06/17/2016 at 01:30:00 PM at North County in N-31 Timothy M. Casserly. | |
March 14, 2016 | Docket Event | The Motion Hearing (Civil) was rescheduled to 06/17/2016 at 01:30:00 PM in N-31 before Timothy M. Casserly at North County. | |
March 09, 2016 | Docket Event | Motion Hearing (Civil) scheduled for 03/25/2016 at 01:30:00 PM at North County in N-31 Timothy M. Casserly was vacated. | |
March 03, 2016 | Docket Event |
Notice of Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings (3/25/16) filed by Del Mar Beach Club Owner's Association; Del Mar Shores Terrace Homeowner's Association; Homeowner's Association of the Solana Beach & Tennis Club; Seascape Chateau Condominium Association; Seascape Shores Management Corporation; Seascape Surf Management Corporation; Surfsong Owner's Association. |
|
March 03, 2016 | Docket Event |
Notice of Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings Request for Judicial Notice (3/25/16) filed by Del Mar Beach Club Owner's Association; Del Mar Shores Terrace Homeowner's Association; Homeowner's Association of the Solana Beach & Tennis Club; Seascape Chateau Condominium Association; Seascape Shores Management Corporation; Seascape Surf Management Corporation; Surfsong Owner's Association. |
|
March 03, 2016 | Docket Event |
Notice of Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings Memorandum of Points and Authorities (3/25/16) filed by Del Mar Beach Club Owner's Association; Del Mar Shores Terrace Homeowner's Association; Homeowner's Association of the Solana Beach & Tennis Club; Seascape Chateau Condominium Association; Seascape Shores Management Corporation; Seascape Surf Management Corporation; Surfsong Owner's Association. |
|
November 30, 2015 | Docket Event | The Motion Hearing (Civil) was rescheduled to 03/25/2016 at 01:30:00 PM in N-31 before Timothy M. Casserly at North County. | |
November 30, 2015 | Docket Event | Motion Hearing (Civil) scheduled for 03/25/2016 at 01:30:00 PM at North County in N-31 Timothy M. Casserly. | |
September 24, 2015 | Docket Event | Motion Hearing (Civil) scheduled for 02/26/2016 at 01:30:00 PM at North County in N-31 Timothy M. Casserly. | |
April 29, 2015 | Docket Event | Notice of Change of Address / Telephone Number filed by California Coastal Commission. |
|
April 17, 2015 | Docket Event | Answer filed by City of Solana Beach. |
|
April 16, 2015 | Docket Event | Answer filed by California Coastal Commission. |
|
March 05, 2015 | Docket Event | Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (Minutes Only) SD generated. |
|
March 05, 2015 | Docket Event | Matter decided. | |
March 05, 2015 | Docket Event |
Minute Order Miscellaneous Minute Order Finalized. |
|
February 27, 2015 | Docket Event |
Minute Order Minutes finalized for Multiple Events heard 02/27/2015 01:30:00 PM. |
|
February 27, 2015 | Docket Event | Matter taken under submission. | |
February 26, 2015 | Docket Event | Tentative Ruling for Demurrer / Motion to Strike published. | |
February 20, 2015 | Docket Event | Reply (2/27/15) filed by California Coastal Commission. |
|
February 20, 2015 | Docket Event | Reply filed by City of Solana Beach. |
|
February 13, 2015 | Docket Event | Opposition to Noticed Motion and Supporting Declarations (02/27/15 - Demurrer OF CITY OF SOLANA BEACH) filed by Homeowner's Association of the Solana Beach & Tennis Club; Del Mar Beach Club Owner's Association; Surfsong Owner's Association; Seascape Shores Management Corporation; Seascape Chateau Condominium Association; Seascape Surf Management Corporation; Del Mar Shores Terrace Homeowner's Association. |
|
November 03, 2014 | Docket Event | Request for Judicial Notice filed by City of Solana Beach. |
|
November 03, 2014 | Docket Event | Demurrer (2/27/14) filed by City of Solana Beach. |
|
October 31, 2014 | Docket Event | Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed by California Coastal Commission. |
|
October 31, 2014 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing filed by California Coastal Commission. |
|
October 21, 2014 | Docket Event | Demurrer / Motion to Strike scheduled for 02/27/2015 at 01:30:00 PM at North County in N-31 Timothy M. Casserly. | |
October 03, 2014 | Docket Event | Amended Petition (***2nd AMENDED***) filed by Homeowner's Association of the Solana Beach & Tennis Club; Del Mar Beach Club Owner's Association; Surfsong Owner's Association; Seascape Shores Management Corporation; Seascape Chateau Condominium Association; Seascape Surf Management Corporation; Del Mar Shores Terrace Homeowner's Association. |
|
May 22, 2014 | Docket Event | Motion Hearing (Civil) scheduled for 05/23/2014 at 01:30:00 PM at North County in N-31 Timothy M. Casserly was vacated. | |
April 17, 2014 | Docket Event | Answer filed by Homeowner's Association of the Solana Beach & Tennis Club; Del Mar Beach Club Owner's Association; Surfsong Owner's Association; Seascape Shores Management Corporation; Seascape Chateau Condominium Association; Seascape Surf Management Corporation; Del Mar Shores Terrace Homeowner's Association. Refers to: California Coastal Commission |
|
March 17, 2014 | Docket Event | Complaint in Intervention filed by California Coastal Commission. Refers to: City of Solana Beach; Del Mar Beach Club Owner's Association; Del Mar Shores Terrace Homeowner's Association; Homeowner's Association of the Solana Beach & Tennis Club; Kaufmann, Steven; Seascape Chateau Condominium Association; Seascape Shores Management Corporation; Seascape Surf Management Corporation; Surfsong Owner's Association |
|
March 03, 2014 | Docket Event |
Stipulation - Other (and order for California Coastal Commission intervention) Stipulation - Other (and order to California Coastal Commission intervention) filed by California Coastal Commission. |
|
February 28, 2014 | Docket Event | Stipulation - Other (to California Coastal Commission intervention) submitted by California Coastal Commission received but not filed on 02/28/2014. | |
January 29, 2014 | Docket Event | Motion - Other (Motion to Intervene-ON 5/23/2014) filed by California Coastal Commission. Refers to: Del Mar Beach Club Owner's Association; Del Mar Shores Terrace Homeowner's Association; Homeowner's Association of the Solana Beach & Tennis Club; Kaufmann, Steven; Seascape Chateau Condominium Association; Seascape Shores Management Corporation; Seascape Surf Management Corporation; Surfsong Owner's Association; City of Solana Beach |
|
January 23, 2014 | Docket Event | Motion Hearing (Civil) scheduled for 05/23/2014 at 01:30:00 PM at North County in N-31 Timothy M. Casserly. | |
December 12, 2013 | Docket Event | Matter decided. | |
December 12, 2013 | Docket Event | Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (Minutes Only) SD generated. |
|
December 12, 2013 | Docket Event |
Minute Order Miscellaneous Minute Order Finalized. |
|
December 11, 2013 | Docket Event | Request for Judicial Notice (FURTHER SUPPLEMENTAL REQUEST) filed by City of Solana Beach. |
|
December 06, 2013 | Docket Event | Matter taken under submission. | |
December 06, 2013 | Docket Event |
Minute Order Minutes finalized for Demurrer / Motion to Strike heard 12/06/2013 01:30:00 PM. |
|
December 05, 2013 | Docket Event | Tentative Ruling for Demurrer / Motion to Strike published. | |
December 04, 2013 | Docket Event | Notice of Change of Address / Telephone Number filed by Homeowner's Association of the Solana Beach & Tennis Club. |
|
November 27, 2013 | Docket Event | Reply to Opposition of Noticed Motion and Supporting Declarations (12/06/13-WRIT OF MANDATE) filed by City of Solana Beach. |
|
November 25, 2013 | Docket Event | Opposition to Noticed Motion and Supporting Declarations (12/06/13-REVISED OPPOSITION TO Demurrer) filed by Homeowner's Association of the Solana Beach & Tennis Club. |
|
November 22, 2013 | Docket Event | Correspondence filed by The Superior Court of San Diego. |
|
November 21, 2013 | Docket Event | Opposition - Other filed by Homeowner's Association of the Solana Beach & Tennis Club. |
|
November 04, 2013 | Docket Event |
Minute Order Miscellaneous Minute Order Finalized. |
|
November 04, 2013 | Docket Event | Demurrer / Motion to Strike reassigned to Timothy M. Casserly for 12/06/2013 at 01:30:00 PM in N-31 at North County. | |
November 04, 2013 | Docket Event | Demurrer / Motion to Strike scheduled for 12/06/2013 at 01:30:00 PM at North County in N-31 Timothy M. Casserly. | |
November 04, 2013 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing SD generated. | |
November 04, 2013 | Docket Event |
Notice of Case Reassignment SD Case reassigned from Judge Dahlquist, Robert P to Timothy Casserly effective 11/04/2013 Judge: Dahlquist Robert P to Timothy Casserly effective 11/04/2013 |
|
October 25, 2013 | Docket Event |
Minute Order Minutes finalized for Civil Case Management Conference heard 10/25/2013 09:00:00 AM. |
|
October 24, 2013 | Docket Event | Notice of Motion and Supporting Declarations filed by City of Solana Beach. |
|
October 24, 2013 | Docket Event | Demurrer filed by City of Solana Beach. |
|
October 23, 2013 | Docket Event | Demurrer / Motion to Strike scheduled for 12/06/2013 at 01:30:00 PM at North County in N-29 Robert P Dahlquist. | |
October 21, 2013 | Docket Event | Case Management Statement filed by Homeowner's Association of the Solana Beach & Tennis Club. Refers to: Del Mar Beach Club Owner's Association; Del Mar Shores Terrace Homeowner's Association; Homeowner's Association of the Solana Beach & Tennis Club; Seascape Chateau Condominium Association; Seascape Shores Management Corporation; Seascape Surf Management Corporation; Surfsong Owner's Association |
|
October 10, 2013 | Docket Event | Case Management Statement filed by City of Solana Beach. Refers to: Homeowner's Association of the Solana Beach & Tennis Club |
|
September 26, 2013 | Docket Event | Stipulation - Other - Fee Due (and order regarding extension of time to file answer or other response to 1st amended verified petition) filed by Homeowner's Association of the Solana Beach & Tennis Club. Refers to: City of Solana Beach |
|
August 26, 2013 | Docket Event | Case reassigned from N-29 to Robert Dahlquist effective 08/26/2013 | |
August 21, 2013 | Docket Event | Notice - Other (Joinder of Objection to Notice of Related Cases) filed by City of Solana Beach. |
|
August 21, 2013 | Docket Event | Objections (Notice of Related Case(s)) filed by California Coastal Commission. |
|
August 21, 2013 | Docket Event | Notice - Other (Notice of General Appearance) filed by City of Solana Beach. |
|
August 20, 2013 | Docket Event | Amended Petition (***1st AMENDED***) filed by Del Mar Beach Club Owner's Association; Del Mar Shores Terrace Homeowner's Association; Homeowner's Association of the Solana Beach & Tennis Club; Seascape Chateau Condominium Association; Seascape Shores Management Corporation; Seascape Surf Management Corporation; Surfsong Owner's Association. Refers to: City of Solana Beach |
|
August 14, 2013 | Docket Event | Notice of Related Case filed by Homeowner's Association of the Solana Beach & Tennis Club. |
|
May 15, 2013 | Docket Event | Returned Mail filed by The Superior Court of San Diego. |
|
April 29, 2013 | Docket Event | Original Summons filed by Homeowner's Association of the Solana Beach & Tennis Club; Del Mar Beach Club Owner's Association; Surfsong Owner's Association; Seascape Shores Management Corporation; Seascape Chateau Condominium Association; Del Mar Shores Terrace Homeowner's Association. Refers to: City of Solana Beach |
|
April 29, 2013 | Docket Event | Summons issued. | |
April 26, 2013 | Docket Event | Notice of Case Assignment SD generated. |
|
April 26, 2013 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing SD Civil Case Management Conference scheduled for 10/25/2013 at 09:00:00 AM at North County in N-29 . |
|
April 26, 2013 | Docket Event | Case reassigned from N-26 to N-29 effective 04/26/2013. | |
April 26, 2013 | Docket Event | Petition for Writ of Mandate filed by Homeowner's Association of the Solana Beach & Tennis Club; Del Mar Beach Club Owner's Association; Surfsong Owner's Association; Seascape Shores Management Corporation; Seascape Chateau Condominium Association; Seascape Surf Management Corporation; Del Mar Shores Terrace Homeowner's Association. Refers to: City of Solana Beach; California Coastal Commission |
|
April 26, 2013 | Docket Event | Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Homeowner's Association of the Solana Beach & Tennis Club; Del Mar Beach Club Owner's Association; Surfsong Owner's Association; Seascape Shores Management Corporation; Seascape Chateau Condominium Association; Seascape Surf Management Corporation; Del Mar Shores Terrace Homeowner's Association. Refers to: City of Solana Beach |
|
April 26, 2013 | Docket Event |
Notice of Case Assignment SD Case initiation form printed. |
|
April 26, 2013 | Docket Event | Case assigned to Department N-26. |