We are checking for the latest updates in this case. We will email you when the process is complete.
Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
San Marcos Gardens, Lp ,
filed a(n)
Unlawful Detainer -
Property
case
represented by
Relph, Christine M ,
against
Santana, Juana ,
Santana, Antonia ,
in the jurisdiction of San Diego County.
This case was filed in
San Diego County
Superior Courts
.
Filing Date
April 26, 2013
Last Refreshed
February 23, 2021
Filing Location
San Diego County, CA
Matter Type
Unlawful Detainer
Case Events for
San Marcos Gardens, Lp v. Santana, Juana
, et al.
Date
Type
Description
July 22, 2013
Docket Event
Request for Dismissal without Prejudice - Entire Action filed by San Marcos Gardens, LP.
Get Document
July 22, 2013
Docket Event
Complaint Demanding Less than $10,000 dismissed without prejudice as to San Marcos Gardens, LP.
July 22, 2013
Docket Event
Complaint Demanding Less than $10,000 dismissed without prejudice as to Santana, Juana .
July 22, 2013
Docket Event
Complaint Demanding Less than $10,000 dismissed without prejudice as to Santana, Antonia .
July 22, 2013
Docket Event
OSC - Why Case Should Not be Dismissed (Unlawful Detainer) scheduled for 09/20/2013 at 08:30:00 AM at North County in N-08 was vacated.
July 12, 2013
Docket Event
Notice of Hearing SD OSC - Why Case Should Not be Dismissed (Unlawful Detainer) scheduled for 09/20/2013 at 08:30:00 AM at North County in N-08 .
Get Document
April 26, 2013
Docket Event
Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by San Marcos Gardens, LP. Refers to: Santana, Antonia; Santana, Juana
Get Document
April 26, 2013
Docket Event
Summons issued.
April 26, 2013
Docket Event
Notice that you have been sued SD Case initiation form printed.
Get Document
April 26, 2013
Docket Event
Original Summons filed by San Marcos Gardens, LP. Refers to: Santana, Antonia; Santana, Juana
Get Document
See all events
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.