Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Garcia, Rafael, filed a(n) Harassment - Torts case against De La Rosa, Rita, in the jurisdiction of San Diego County. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 26, 2013 |
CategoryCivil - Unlimited |
Last RefreshedFebruary 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSan Diego County, CA |
Matter TypeHarassment |
Case Cycle Time39 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 04, 2013 | Docket Event | Proof of Service (Unsuccessful Service of Order after Hearing) filed by Garcia, Rafael. Refers to: De La Rosa, Rita | |
May 20, 2013 | Docket Event | Ex Parte Application - Other and Supporting Documents filed by Garcia, Rafael. | |
May 20, 2013 | Docket Event | Ex Parte scheduled for 05/22/2013 at 08:30:00 AM at Central in C-11 . | |
May 13, 2013 | Docket Event | Civil Harassment Restraining Order After Hearing (CLETS-CHO) filed by Garcia, Rafael. | |
May 13, 2013 | Docket Event | Minutes finalized for Hearing on Restraining Order heard 05/13/2013 08:30:00 AM. | |
May 13, 2013 | Docket Event | Restraining order as requested against Rita Delarosa was granted. | |
May 07, 2013 | Docket Event | Proof of Personal Service filed by Garcia, Rafael. Refers to: De La Rosa, Rita | |
April 26, 2013 | Docket Event | Minutes finalized for Ex Parte heard 04/26/2013 01:00:00 PM. | |
April 26, 2013 | Docket Event | Notice of Court Hearing (Civil Harassment Prevention) filed by Garcia, Rafael. Refers to: De La Rosa, Rita | |
April 26, 2013 | Docket Event | Temporary Restraining Order (Civil Harassment Prevention) filed by Garcia, Rafael. Refers to: De La Rosa, Rita |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.