Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Citibank Na, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Clinnin, John A, against Lara, Erica, in the jurisdiction of San Diego County. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
||
Filing DateMarch 19, 2013 |
CategoryCivil - Limited |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions63 days |
Filing LocationSan Diego County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Cycle Time122 days |
Complaint Demanding Less than $10,000 filed by Citibank NA. Refers to: Lara, Erica
Date: March 19, 2013Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Citibank NA. Refers to: Lara, Erica
Date: 2013-03-19T00:00:00Original Summons filed by Citibank NA. Refers to: Lara, Erica
Date: 2013-03-19T00:00:00Case initiation form printed.
Date: March 20, 2013Request for Dismissal without Prejudice - Entire Action filed by Citibank NA.
Date: July 19, 2013Request for Entry of Default filed by Citibank NA. Refers to: Lara, Erica
Date: May 21, 2013For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.