Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Ybarra, James R, filed a(n) Harassment - Torts case against Otroll, Bryant, in the jurisdiction of San Diego County. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts with Francis M. Devaney presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeFrancis M. Devaney Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 04, 2013 |
CategoryCivil - Unlimited |
Last RefreshedFebruary 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSan Diego County, CA |
Matter TypeHarassment |
Case Cycle Time34 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 07, 2013 | Docket Event | Temporary Restraining Order dissolved. | |
February 07, 2013 | Docket Event | Hearing on Restraining Order reassigned to for 02/07/2013 at 01:30:00 PM in S-08 at South County. | |
February 07, 2013 | Docket Event | Hearing on Restraining Order scheduled for 02/07/2013 at 01:30:00 PM at South County in S-08 . | |
February 07, 2013 | Docket Event | Minutes finalized for Hearing on Restraining Order heard 02/07/2013 01:30:00 PM. | |
February 07, 2013 | Docket Event | Restraining order as requested denied without prejudice. | |
January 23, 2013 | Docket Event | Minutes finalized for Hearing on Restraining Order heard 01/23/2013 01:30:00 PM. | |
January 23, 2013 | Docket Event | Hearing on Restraining Order continued pursuant to party's motion to 02/07/2013 at 01:30PM in Department S-09. | |
January 23, 2013 | Docket Event | Notice of New Hearing Date and Order on Reissuance filed by YBARRA, JAMES R. Refers to: OTROLL, BRYANT | |
January 10, 2013 | Docket Event | Proof of Personal Service - Petition filed by YBARRA, JAMES R. Refers to: OTROLL, BRYANT | |
January 04, 2013 | Docket Event | Ex Parte scheduled for 01/04/2013 at 01:30:00 PM at South County in S-09 . |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.