Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Levy, David J, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Williams, Daniel J, against Rapport, Nancy Delores, Rapport, Michael S, Msr Properties, Llc, Msr Entertainment, Inc, Basic Old Town Roseville, Llc, (total of 5) See All represented by Trost, Thomas G, Engle, Melissa N, in the jurisdiction of San Diego County. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts with Timothy Taylor presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateSeptember 26, 2012 |
CategoryCivil - Unlimited |
Time To Trial345 days |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions44 days |
Filing LocationSan Diego County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
|
Case Cycle Time1954 days |
Original Summons filed by Levy, David J. Refers to: Rapport, Michael
Date: 2012-09-26T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Levy, David J. Refers to: Rapport, Michael
Date: 2012-09-26T00:00:00Reply to Opposition of Noticed Motion and Supporting Declarations filed by Rapport, Michael S.
Date: 2013-07-26T00:00:00Motion to Set Aside Default filed by Rapport, Michael S.
Date: 2013-05-07T00:00:00Notice of Hearing SD generated.
Date: 2013-08-02T00:00:00Order After Hearing (Order granting dfnt's motion to set aside default) filed by Rapport, Michael S.
Date: 2013-08-02T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail filed by Rapport, Michael S.
Date: 2013-08-23T00:00:00Notice of Jury Fee Deposit filed by Rapport, Michael S.
Date: 2013-08-23T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed by Rapport, Michael S.
Date: 2013-08-23T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Civil Case Management Conference heard 09/06/2013 09:15:00 AM.
Date: 2013-09-06T00:00:00Notice of Hearing SD generated.
Date: 2013-09-06T00:00:00Answer filed by Rapport, Nancy.
Date: 2013-10-17T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed by Levy, David J.
Date: 2013-08-29T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney filed by Levy, David J.
Date: 2013-08-19T00:00:00[Another document for ROA# 56]
Date: 2013-11-21T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Ex Parte heard 01/02/2014 08:30:00 AM.
Date: 2014-01-02T00:00:00Order Granting Attorney's Motion to be Relieved as Counsel filed by Rapport, Nancy.
Date: 2014-02-07T00:00:00Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel of Record filed by Rapport, Nancy.
Date: 2014-01-15T00:00:00Order Granting Attorney's Motion to be Relieved as Counsel filed by Rapport, Michael S; Rapport, Nancy.
Date: 2014-02-07T00:00:00Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel of Record filed by Rapport, Michael S.
Date: 2014-01-15T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Discovery Hearing heard 02/28/2014 01:30:00 PM.
Date: 2014-02-28T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Judgment filed by Levy, David J.
Date: 2014-03-04T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Discovery Hearing heard 03/07/2014 01:30:00 PM.
Date: 2014-03-07T00:00:00Order After Hearing (Order compelling initial responses to written discovery) filed by Levy, David J.
Date: 2014-03-07T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Motion Hearing (Civil) heard 02/07/2014 01:30:00 PM.
Date: 2014-02-07T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney filed by Rapport, Nancy Delores; Rapport, Nancy.
Date: 2014-03-19T00:00:00Motion to Compel Discovery (to compel Initial Responses to Written Discovery) filed by Levy, David J.
Date: 2014-02-06T00:00:00Order After Hearing (Order compelling initial responses to written discovery) filed by Levy, David J.
Date: 2014-02-28T00:00:00Motion to Quash Service of Summons filed by Rapport, Nancy.
Date: 2014-03-28T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail filed by Levy, David J.
Date: 2014-03-10T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Ex Parte heard 04/01/2014 08:30:00 AM.
Date: 2014-04-01T00:00:00Declaration - Other (Dec of David L Skilling) filed by Rapport, Nancy.
Date: 2014-03-28T00:00:00Opposition to Noticed Motion and Supporting Declarations filed by Levy, David J.
Date: 2014-04-04T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Judgment filed by Levy, David J.
Date: 2014-03-10T00:00:00Declaration - Other (DEC OF FAULT BY MATTHEW J FAUST) filed by Rapport, Nancy.
Date: 2014-03-28T00:00:00Ex Parte Application for Order Shortening Time filed by Rapport, Nancy Delores.
Date: 2014-03-28T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney submitted by Rapport, Michael S rejected on 04/18/2014.
Date: 2014-04-18T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Multiple Events heard 04/11/2014 01:30:00 PM.
Date: 2014-04-11T00:00:00Motion for Change of Venue filed by Rapport, Nancy Delores.
Date: 2014-07-21T00:00:00Proof of Service filed by Levy, David J.
Date: 2014-04-11T00:00:00Order to Appear SD generated.
Date: 2014-05-02T00:00:00Miscellaneous Minute Order Finalized.
Date: 2014-04-11T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Judgment filed by Levy, David J.
Date: 2014-04-16T00:00:00Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (Minutes Only) SD generated.
Date: 2014-04-11T00:00:00Minutes finalized for OSC - Why Case Should Not be Dismissed heard 05/23/2014 09:00:00 AM.
Date: 2014-05-23T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Trial Readiness Conference (Civil) heard 05/02/2014 09:00:00 AM.
Date: 2014-05-02T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice (IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO MOVE VENUE) filed by Rapport, Nancy Delores.
Date: 2014-07-21T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Civil Case Management Conference heard 07/25/2014 09:45:00 AM.
Date: 2014-07-25T00:00:00Case initiation form printed.
Date: 2012-09-26T00:00:00Certificate of Service filed by Levy, David J.
Date: 2012-10-30T00:00:00Notice of Change in Handling Attorney filed by Levy, David J.
Date: 2012-10-30T00:00:00Case reassigned from Alksne,Lorna to Taylor,Timothy effective 12/01/2012
Date: 2012-12-01T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Motion Hearing (Civil) heard 08/02/2013 01:30:00 PM.
Date: 2013-08-02T00:00:00The default filed by Levy, David J was denied. Refers to: Rapport, Michael
Date: 2013-01-18T00:00:00Declaration - Other (of Thomas G Trost) filed by Rapport, Nancy Delores; Rapport, Nancy Delores.
Date: 2014-09-26T00:00:00Declaration - Other (of Nancy Delores) filed by Rapport, Nancy Delores; Rapport, Nancy Delores.
Date: 2014-09-26T00:00:00Opposition to Noticed Motion and Supporting Declarations filed by Levy, David J.
Date: 2014-09-18T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed by Rapport, Nancy Delores; Rapport, Nancy Delores.
Date: 2014-09-18T00:00:00Objections filed by Rapport, Nancy Delores; Rapport, Nancy Delores.
Date: 2014-09-26T00:00:00Declaration - Other (of Michael S Rapport) filed by Rapport, Nancy Delores; Rapport, Nancy Delores.
Date: 2014-09-26T00:00:00Reply to Opposition - Other filed by Rapport, Nancy Delores; Rapport, Nancy Delores.
Date: 2014-09-26T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice filed by Rapport, Nancy Delores; Rapport, Nancy Delores.
Date: 2014-09-26T00:00:00Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt filed by Levy, David J. Refers to: MSR Entertainment, Inc
Date: 2015-04-03T00:00:00[Another document for ROA# 165]
Date: 2015-04-16T00:00:00[Another document for ROA# 167]
Date: 2015-04-16T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Multiple Events heard 10/03/2014 09:45:00 AM.
Date: 2014-10-03T00:00:00Ex Parte Application - Other and Supporting Documents filed by Levy, David J.
Date: 2016-10-31T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address / Telephone Number filed by Levy, David J.
Date: 2015-03-10T00:00:00Notice of Hearing SD generated.
Date: 2014-10-03T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Discovery Hearing heard 01/16/2015 01:30:00 PM.
Date: 2015-01-16T00:00:00The default filed by Levy, David J was denied. Refers to: MSR Entertainment, Inc
Date: 2015-04-16T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default (ENTERED) filed by Levy, David J. Refers to: Basic Old Town Roseville, LLC
Date: 2016-09-26T00:00:00The default was denied as to Rapport, Michael S on Complaint filed by Levy, David J .
Date: 2015-04-03T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Trial Readiness Conference (Civil) heard 04/03/2015 09:00:00 AM.
Date: 2015-04-03T00:00:00Statement of Damages (MSR Entertainment Inc) filed by Levy, David J. Refers to: MSR Entertainment, Inc
Date: 2016-09-26T00:00:00Default Prove-Up Hearing scheduled for 11/04/2016 at 10:30:00 AM at Central in C-72 Timothy Taylor.
Date: 2016-09-28T00:00:00Statement of Damages (MSR Properties LLC) filed by Levy, David J. Refers to: MSR Properties, LLC
Date: 2016-09-26T00:00:00Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Party filed by Levy, David J. Refers to: Rapport, Nancy
Date: 2015-03-26T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default filed by Levy, David J. Refers to: Rapport, Michael
Date: 2015-04-03T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default filed by Levy, David J. Refers to: Rapport, Michael
Date: 2016-06-07T00:00:00Order After Hearing (Order granting ex parte application) filed by The Superior Court of San Diego.
Date: 2016-11-01T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Ex Parte heard 11/01/2016 08:30:00 AM.
Date: 2016-11-01T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Default Prove-Up Hearing heard 04/07/2017 10:30:00 AM.
Date: April 07, 2017Writ of Execution submitted by Levy, David J rejected on 08/10/2017.
Date: August 10, 2017Default Prove-Up Hearing scheduled for 04/07/2017 at 10:30:00 AM at Central in C-72 Timothy Taylor.
Date: 2017-03-03T00:00:00Abstract of Judgment issued.
Date: July 25, 2017Notice - Other (NOTICE OF TERMINATION OR MODIFICATION OF STAY) filed by Levy, David J.
Date: 2017-02-10T00:00:00Writ of Execution submitted by Levy, David J rejected on 02/01/2018.
Date: February 01, 2018For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.