Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Ge Capital Retail Bank, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Natarajan, Tara, against Gagen, William, in the jurisdiction of San Diego County. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
||
Filing DateDecember 31, 2012 |
CategoryCivil - Limited |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions135 days |
Filing LocationSan Diego County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Cycle Time2284 days |
Writ of Execution issued.
Date: March 28, 2017Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by GE Capital Retail Bank. Refers to: Gagen, William
Date: 2012-12-31T00:00:00Writ of Execution Returned - Unsatisfied filed by GE Capital Retail Bank.
Date: December 11, 2017Writ of Execution issued.
Date: July 07, 2015Writ of Execution Returned - Partially Satisfied filed by GE Capital Retail Bank.
Date: August 05, 2015Certificate of Service filed by GE Capital Retail Bank.
Date: 2013-01-24T00:00:00Original Summons filed by GE Capital Retail Bank. Refers to: Gagen, William
Date: 2012-12-31T00:00:00Case initiation form printed.
Date: 2013-01-02T00:00:00Abstract of Judgment issued.
Date: April 03, 2019Complaint Demanding Less than $10,000 filed by GE Capital Retail Bank. Refers to: Gagen, William
Date: 2012-12-31T00:00:00Writ of Execution Returned - Unsatisfied filed by GE Capital Retail Bank.
Date: January 12, 2016Writ of Execution issued.
Date: May 31, 2014Judgment by Default by Clerk filed by GE Capital Retail Bank. Refers to: Gagen, William
Date: 2014-02-04T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.