Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Unifund Ccr Llc, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Miguel, Christopher A, against Carpenter, James F, in the jurisdiction of San Diego County. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
||
Filing DateDecember 31, 2012 |
CategoryCivil - Limited |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions170 days |
Filing LocationSan Diego County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Cycle Time791 days |
Abstract of Judgment issued.
Date: May 03, 2014Certificate of Service filed by Unifund CCR LLC.
Date: 2013-01-24T00:00:00Judgment by Default by Court filed by Unifund CCR LLC. Refers to: Carpenter, James
Date: December 18, 2013Writ of Execution issued.
Date: May 17, 2014Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Unifund CCR LLC. Refers to: Carpenter, James
Date: 2012-12-31T00:00:00Case initiation form printed.
Date: 2013-01-02T00:00:00Original Summons filed by Unifund CCR LLC. Refers to: Carpenter, James
Date: 2012-12-31T00:00:00Declaration - Other (re: Venue) filed by Unifund CCR LLC. Refers to: Carpenter, James
Date: 2012-12-31T00:00:00Complaint Demanding Less than $10,000 filed by Unifund CCR LLC. Refers to: Carpenter, James
Date: 2012-12-31T00:00:00Writ of Execution Returned - Partially Satisfied filed by Unifund CCR LLC.
Date: March 02, 2015For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.