Universal Roll Forming Inc,
filed a(n)
Civil - Unlimited
case
represented by
Weissman, Robert A,
against
Federal Insurance Company,
Fidelity And Deposit Company Of Maryland,
Flatiron West Inc,
Flatiron West Sukut Construction,
Liberty Mutual Insurance Company,
(total of 9)
See All
in the jurisdiction of San Diego County.
This case was filed in
San Diego County
Superior Courts
with Timothy Taylor presiding.
Case Details for
Universal Roll Forming Inc v. Federal Insurance Company
, et al.
Case Events for
Universal Roll Forming Inc v. Federal Insurance Company
, et al.
Date
Type
Description
March 04, 2013
Docket Event
Civil Case Management Conference scheduled for 05/31/2013 at 09:15:00 AM at Central in C-72 Timothy Taylor was vacated.
February 19, 2013
Docket Event
Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action filed by Universal Roll Forming Inc.
January 03, 2013
Docket Event
Summons issued.
January 03, 2013
Docket Event
Civil Case Management Conference scheduled for 05/31/2013 at 09:15:00 AM at Central in C-72 Timothy Taylor.
January 03, 2013
Docket Event
Notice of Case Assignment SD Case initiation form printed.
December 31, 2012
Docket Event
Original Summons filed by Universal Roll Forming Inc. Refers to: State of California Department of Transportation; Flatiron West Sukut Construction; Flatiron West Inc; Sukut Construction Inc; Modern Alloys Inc; Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America
December 31, 2012
Docket Event
Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Universal Roll Forming Inc. Refers to: State of California Department of Transportation; Flatiron West Sukut Construction; Flatiron West Inc; Sukut Construction Inc; Modern Alloys Inc; Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America
December 31, 2012
Docket Event
Case assigned to Judicial Officer Taylor, Timothy.
Judge: Taylor Timothy
December 31, 2012
Docket Event
Complaint filed by Universal Roll Forming Inc. Refers to: State of California Department of Transportation; Flatiron West Sukut Construction; Flatiron West Inc; Sukut Construction Inc; Modern Alloys Inc; Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America; Liberty Mutual Insurance Company; Zurich American Insurance Company; Federal Insurance Company; Fidelity and Deposit Company of Maryland