Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case represented by Wilks, Robert A, against Espinosa, Elena Hernandez, in the jurisdiction of San Diego County. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts with Joel M. Pressman presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJoel M. Pressman Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateDecember 31, 2012 |
CategoryCivil - Unlimited |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions120 days |
Filing LocationSan Diego County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
|
Case Cycle Time121 days |
Original Summons filed by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. Refers to: Espinosa, Elena
Date: 2012-12-31T00:00:00Complaint filed by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. Refers to: Espinosa, Elena
Date: 2012-12-31T00:00:00Notice - Other (Notice of CMC) filed by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company.
Date: 2013-04-16T00:00:00Certificate of Service filed by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company.
Date: 2013-01-17T00:00:00Case initiation form printed.
Date: 2013-01-02T00:00:00Statement of Case filed by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company.
Date: 2013-04-24T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.