Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Takuyo Corporation; Dba : Lighthouse, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Melhouse, Christina, against Tedokon, Tsutomu ; Dba : Tedokon Landscape Construction, in the jurisdiction of San Diego County. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
||
Filing DateDecember 31, 2012 |
CategoryCivil - Limited |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions81 days |
Filing LocationSan Diego County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Cycle Time891 days |
Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Takuyo Corporation. Refers to: Tedokon, Tsutomu
Date: 2012-12-31T00:00:00Case initiation form printed.
Date: 2013-01-02T00:00:00Judgment by Default by Clerk filed by Takuyo Corporation. Refers to: Tedokon, Tsutomu
Date: 2013-10-15T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Judgment Debtor Exam (Civil) heard 06/09/2015 01:45:00 PM.
Date: June 09, 2015Complaint Demanding Less than $10,000 filed by Takuyo Corporation. Refers to: Tedokon, Tsutomu
Date: 2012-12-31T00:00:00Writ of Execution issued.
Date: 2014-03-31T00:00:00Original Summons filed by Takuyo Corporation. Refers to: Tedokon, Tsutomu
Date: 2012-12-31T00:00:00Writ of Execution Returned - Unsatisfied filed by Takuyo Corporation.
Date: April 14, 2015Substitution of Attorney filed by Takuyo Corporation.
Date: April 14, 2015Writ of Execution issued.
Date: June 10, 2015For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.