Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Belleme Homeowners Association, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Schwartz, Jamie, against Lucas, Karen, Lucas, Christopher, in the jurisdiction of San Diego County. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts with Kenneth J. Medel presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateSeptember 28, 2012 |
CategoryCivil - Limited |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions87 days |
Filing LocationSan Diego County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Cycle Time1315 days |
Case initiation form printed.
Date: 2012-10-01T00:00:00Case reassigned from Medel,Kenneth to C-07 effective 11/18/2012.
Date: 2012-11-18T00:00:00Original Summons filed by Belleme Homeowners Association. Refers to: Lucas, Christopher; Lucas, Karen
Date: 2012-10-01T00:00:00Notice of Change of Firm Name filed by Belleme Homeowners Association.
Date: 2013-01-22T00:00:00Abstract of Judgment issued.
Date: February 05, 2014Writ of Execution Returned - Wholly Satisfied filed by Belleme Homeowners Association.
Date: December 15, 2015Request for Dismissal of Does filed by Belleme Homeowners Association.
Date: 2013-01-22T00:00:00Satisfaction of Judgment - full filed by Belleme Homeowners Association.
Date: May 05, 2016Writ of Execution issued.
Date: April 07, 2015For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.