Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Seabright Insurance Company, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Aires, Timothy Carl, against Jci Metal Products, represented by Cauley, Kevin T, in the jurisdiction of San Diego County. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts with Eddie C Sturgeon presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateOctober 31, 2012 |
CategoryCivil - Unlimited |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions183 days |
Filing LocationSan Diego County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Cycle Time308 days |
Complaint filed by Seabright Insurance Company. Refers to: JCI Metal Products
Date: 2012-10-31T00:00:00Case initiation form printed.
Date: 2012-10-31T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Seabright Insurance Company. Refers to: JCI Metal Products
Date: 2012-10-31T00:00:00Certificate of Service filed by Seabright Insurance Company.
Date: 2012-12-17T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Multiple Events heard 05/03/2013 09:00:00 AM.
Date: May 03, 2013Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action (DENIED) filed by Seabright Insurance Company.
Date: September 04, 2013Original Summons filed by Seabright Insurance Company. Refers to: JCI Metal Products
Date: 2012-10-31T00:00:00Answer filed by JCI Metal Products.
Date: 2012-12-10T00:00:00Case reassigned from Judge Wohlfeil, Joel R. to Eddie Sturgeon effective 10/31/2012
Date: 2012-11-02T00:00:00Motion for Leave to Amend (FILE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT) filed by Seabright Insurance Company.
Date: 2013-01-31T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.