Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Diaz, Estela, filed a(n) Harassment - Torts case against Sandler, Raymond, in the jurisdiction of San Diego County. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateOctober 25, 2012 |
CategoryCivil - Unlimited |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSan Diego County, CA |
Matter TypeHarassment |
Case Cycle Time14 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 08, 2012 | Docket Event | Minutes finalized for Hearing on Restraining Order heard 11/08/2012 08:30:00 AM. | |
November 08, 2012 | Docket Event | Restraining order as requested denied . | |
November 08, 2012 | Docket Event | Temporary Restraining Order dissolved. | |
October 29, 2012 | Docket Event | Proof of Personal Service - Petition (TRO) filed by Diaz, Estela. Refers to: Sandler, Raymond | |
October 25, 2012 | Docket Event | Case assigned to Department E-21. | |
October 25, 2012 | Docket Event | Request for Civil Harassment Restraining Orders (Civil Harassment Prevention) filed by Diaz, Estela. | |
October 25, 2012 | Docket Event | Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Diaz, Estela. | |
October 25, 2012 | Docket Event | Ex Parte scheduled for 10/25/2012 at 11:00:00 AM at East County in E-21 . | |
October 25, 2012 | Docket Event | Minutes finalized for Ex Parte heard 10/25/2012 11:00:00 AM. | |
October 25, 2012 | Docket Event | Notice of Court Hearing filed by Diaz, Estela. Refers to: Sandler, Raymond; Lopez, Arianna |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.