Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
O'Leary, Mariela Williams, filed a(n) Harassment - Torts case against Schmitt, Gregory R, in the jurisdiction of San Diego County. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
||
Filing DateOctober 31, 2012 |
CategoryCivil - Unlimited |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions16 days |
Filing LocationSan Diego County, CA |
Matter TypeHarassment |
|
Case Cycle Time1888 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 01, 2018 | Docket Event | Order on Court Fee Waiver, filed by O'Leary, Mariela Williams, on 10/31/2012, has expired. | |
November 16, 2012 | Docket Event | Minutes finalized for Hearing on Restraining Order heard 11/16/2012 08:30:00 AM. | |
November 16, 2012 | Docket Event | Temporary Restraining Order dissolved. | |
November 16, 2012 | Docket Event | Court ordered entire action dismissed without prejudice. | |
October 31, 2012 | Docket Event | Order on Court Fee Waiver filed by O'Leary, Mariela Williams. | |
October 31, 2012 | Docket Event | Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by O'Leary, Mariela Williams. Refers to: Schmitt, Gregory | |
October 31, 2012 | Docket Event | Request to Waive Court Fees filed by O'Leary, Mariela Williams. Refers to: Schmitt, Gregory | |
October 31, 2012 | Docket Event | Case initiation form printed. | |
October 31, 2012 | Docket Event | Temporary Restraining Order filed by O'Leary, Mariela Williams. Refers to: Schmitt, Gregory | |
October 31, 2012 | Docket Event | Notice of Court Hearing filed by O'Leary, Mariela Williams. Refers to: Schmitt, Gregory |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.