Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Ramirez, Maria, Ramirez, Arturo, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Shea, Patrick G, against Torn & Glasser, Inc., Suppose-U-Drive Rental Service; Esa : Suppose U Drive Truck Rental, Henley, Elizabeth, represented by Rutan, Kenneth A, in the jurisdiction of San Diego County. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts with Robert P Dahlquist presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateOctober 24, 2012 |
CategoryCivil - Unlimited |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSan Diego County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Case Cycle Time189 days |
Case Management Statement filed by Torn & Glasser, Inc.; Henley, Elizabeth.
Date: March 28, 2013Case initiation form printed.
Date: 2012-10-24T00:00:00Notice of Dismissal by Court SD generated.
Date: April 12, 2013Minutes finalized for Civil Case Management Conference heard 04/12/2013 09:00:00 AM.
Date: April 12, 2013Answer filed by Suppose-U-Drive Rental Service. Refers to: Ramirez, Arturo; Ramirez, Maria
Date: February 19, 2013Answer filed by Torn & Glasser, Inc.; Henley, Elizabeth. Refers to: Ramirez, Arturo; Ramirez, Maria
Date: 2012-12-27T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.