Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Mineracao Tres Coracoes Ltda; Dba : M3C Stones, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case against Stone Mart Corp, Brazilian Exotic Granite, Inc, represented by Freshman, Ronald H, in the jurisdiction of San Diego County. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts with Robert P Dahlquist presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateOctober 05, 2012 |
CategoryCivil - Unlimited |
Time To Trial175 days |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions363 days |
Filing LocationSan Diego County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
|
Case Cycle Time363 days |
Answer filed by Brazilian Exotic Granite, Inc. Refers to: Mineracao Tres Coracoes LTDA
Date: 2012-10-30T00:00:00Mediation Selection Form filed by Mineracao Tres Coracoes LTDA.
Date: 2013-04-23T00:00:00Certificate of Service filed by Mineracao Tres Coracoes LTDA.
Date: 2012-11-07T00:00:00Notice of Hearing SD generated.
Date: 2013-03-29T00:00:00Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel of Record filed by Mineracao Tres Coracoes LTDA.
Date: 2013-08-13T00:00:00Notice - Other (NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY OF COUNSEL) filed by Mineracao Tres Coracoes LTDA.
Date: 2013-05-24T00:00:00Case initiation form printed.
Date: 2012-10-05T00:00:00Notice of Assignment of Mediator SD generated.
Date: 2013-04-29T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Civil Case Management Conference heard 03/29/2013 09:00:00 AM.
Date: 2013-03-29T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed by Brazilian Exotic Granite, Inc.
Date: 2013-03-29T00:00:00Notice - Other (Notice of Unavailability of Counsel) filed by Mineracao Tres Coracoes LTDA.
Date: 2013-02-27T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Motion Hearing (Civil) heard 09/13/2013 01:30:00 PM.
Date: September 13, 2013Order Granting Attorney's Motion to be Relieved as Counsel filed by Mineracao Tres Coracoes LTDA.
Date: September 16, 2013Proof of Service filed by Mineracao Tres Coracoes LTDA.
Date: September 23, 2013Notice - Other (Entry of Order) filed by Mineracao Tres Coracoes LTDA.
Date: September 26, 2013Advance Trial Review Order filed by Mineracao Tres Coracoes LTDA; Brazilian Exotic Granite, Inc.
Date: September 20, 2013Notice of Ruling filed by The Superior Court of San Diego.
Date: September 19, 2013Minutes finalized for Civil Court Trial heard 10/03/2013 08:30:00 AM.
Date: October 03, 2013Minutes finalized for Trial Readiness Conference (Civil) heard 09/20/2013 10:00:00 AM.
Date: September 20, 2013For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.