Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Donius, Marvin filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case against Mushroom Express Inc, All Those Claiming Interest In Certain Mobile Homes Located At On 377 Valley Center Road Valley Center Ca, represented by Testa, Gregory J, in the jurisdiction of San Diego County. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts with Robert P Dahlquist presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateSeptember 27, 2012 |
CategoryCivil - Unlimited |
Time To Trial148 days |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions83 days |
Filing LocationSan Diego County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
|
Case Cycle Time622 days |
Case reassigned from Judge Stern, Jacqueline M. to Robert Dahlquist effective 10/15/2012
Date: 2012-10-30T00:00:00Case initiation form printed.
Date: 2012-09-27T00:00:00Answer filed by Donius, Marvin. Refers to: Metro Housing Redevelopment Inc (IMAGED)
Date: 2012-11-06T00:00:00Demurrer filed by Mushroom Express Inc. Refers to: Metro Housing Redevelopment Inc (IMAGED)
Date: 2012-11-06T00:00:00Certificate of Service filed by Metro Housing Redevelopment Inc. Refers to: Donius, Marvin
Date: 2012-10-15T00:00:00Answer filed by Metro Housing Redevelopment Inc (IMAGED). Refers to: Donius, Marvin
Date: 2012-12-07T00:00:00Original Summons filed by Donius, Marvin. Refers to: Metro Housing Redevelopment Inc (IMAGED)
Date: 2012-11-08T00:00:00Cross-Complaint filed by Donius, Marvin. Refers to: Metro Housing Redevelopment Inc (IMAGED)
Date: 2012-11-08T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Demurrer / Motion to Strike heard 12/21/2012 01:30:00 PM.
Date: 2012-12-21T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney filed by Mushroom Express Inc; Donius, Marvin.
Date: 2013-05-14T00:00:00Notice of Hearing SD generated.
Date: 2013-02-22T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Motion Hearing (Civil) heard 01/11/2013 01:30:00 PM.
Date: 2013-01-11T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed by Donius, Marvin; Mushroom Express Inc.
Date: 2013-02-13T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Motion Hearing (Civil) heard 04/12/2013 01:30:00 PM.
Date: 2013-04-12T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Civil Case Management Conference heard 02/22/2013 09:00:00 AM.
Date: 2013-02-22T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Motion Hearing (Civil) heard 04/05/2013 01:30:00 PM.
Date: 2013-04-05T00:00:00Mediation Selection Form filed by Metro Housing Redevelopment Inc (IMAGED).
Date: 2013-03-20T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Ex Parte heard 12/13/2012 08:30:00 AM.
Date: 2012-12-13T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address / Telephone Number filed by Metro Housing Redevelopment Inc (IMAGED).
Date: 2013-02-22T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address / Telephone Number filed by Metro Housing Redevelopment Inc (IMAGED).
Date: 2013-02-21T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed by Metro Housing Redevelopment Inc (IMAGED).
Date: 2013-02-22T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Ex Parte heard 06/04/2013 08:30:00 AM.
Date: 2013-06-04T00:00:00Writ of Possession After Hearing Issued for San Diego County
Date: 2013-05-06T00:00:00Order for Writ of Possession filed by Metro Housing Redevelopment Inc (IMAGED).
Date: 2013-04-22T00:00:00Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail SD generated.
Date: March 10, 2014Minutes finalized for Civil Court Trial heard 01/29/2014 08:30:00 AM.
Date: 2014-01-29T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Civil Court Trial heard 12/17/2013 08:30:00 AM.
Date: 2013-12-17T00:00:00Trial Brief (DEFENDANT'S TRIAL BRIEF) filed by Donius, Marvin; Mushroom Express Inc.
Date: 2014-01-28T00:00:00Trial Brief filed by Metro Housing Redevelopment Inc (IMAGED).
Date: 2014-01-28T00:00:00Miscellaneous Minute Order Finalized.
Date: 2014-03-07T00:00:00Mediation Selection Form filed by GLASS, DOUGLAS A.
Date: 2013-08-30T00:00:00Order - Other (DECISION AFTER BENCH TRIAL) filed by The Superior Court of San Diego.
Date: 2014-03-07T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Motion Hearing (Civil) heard 08/16/2013 01:30:00 PM.
Date: 2013-08-16T00:00:00Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail SD generated.
Date: April 09, 2014Minutes finalized for Ex Parte heard 12/12/2013 08:30:00 AM.
Date: 2013-12-12T00:00:00Notice of Rescheduled Hearing SD generated.
Date: 2013-12-17T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Judgment filed by Metro Housing Redevelopment Inc (IMAGED).
Date: April 30, 2014Memorandum of Costs (Summary) ($2481.74) filed by Mushroom Express Inc.
Date: April 25, 2014Minutes finalized for Civil Court Trial heard 01/30/2014 09:00:00 AM.
Date: 2014-01-30T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.