Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Hoaglin, Loretta Lunette, filed a(n) Harassment - Torts case against Mojado, Thomas Christian, in the jurisdiction of San Diego County. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts with Martin W. Staven presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 20, 2012 |
CategoryCivil - Unlimited |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSan Diego County, CA |
Matter TypeHarassment |
Case Cycle Time21 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 10, 2012 | Docket Event | Minutes finalized for Hearing on Restraining Order heard 08/10/2012 08:30:00 AM. | |
August 10, 2012 | Docket Event | Restraining order as requested against Thomas Christian Mojado was granted. | |
July 24, 2012 | Docket Event | Proof of Personal Service - Petition filed by Hoaglin, Loretta Lunette. Refers to: Mojado, Thomas | |
July 20, 2012 | Docket Event | Request for Civil Harassment Restraining Orders (Civil Harassment Prevention) filed by Hoaglin, Loretta Lunette. Refers to: Mojado, Thomas | |
July 20, 2012 | Docket Event | Case initiation form printed. | |
July 20, 2012 | Docket Event | The Temporary Restraining Order as requested against Thomas Christian Mojado was granted. Hearing on Restraining Order set for 08/10/2012 at 08:30AM before Martin W. StavenN-07. All orders to remain in full force and effect pending date of hearing with a 100 stay away order. | |
July 20, 2012 | Docket Event | Case assigned to Department N-07. | |
July 20, 2012 | Docket Event | Hearing on Restraining Order scheduled for 07/20/2012 at 01:40:00 PM at North County in N-07 . | |
July 20, 2012 | Docket Event | Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Hoaglin, Loretta Lunette. Refers to: Mojado, Thomas | |
July 20, 2012 | Docket Event | Minutes finalized for Hearing on Restraining Order heard 07/20/2012 01:40:00 PM. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.