Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Lyon, John W, filed a(n) Unlawful Detainer - Property case represented by Mendez, Alejandra, against Ratzlaff, Norman Peter, in the jurisdiction of San Diego County. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
||
Filing DateOctober 31, 2012 |
CategoryCivil - Limited |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions44 days |
Filing LocationSan Diego County, CA |
Matter TypeUnlawful Detainer |
|
Case Cycle Time90 days |
Complaint Demanding Less than $10,000 filed by Lyon, John W. Refers to: Ratzlaff, Norman
Date: October 31, 2012Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Lyon, John W. Refers to: Ratzlaff, Norman
Date: 2012-10-31T00:00:00Original Summons filed by Lyon, John W. Refers to: Ratzlaff, Norman
Date: 2012-10-31T00:00:00Case initiation form printed.
Date: 2012-10-31T00:00:00Judgment by Default by Clerk for Possession Only filed by Lyon, John W.
Date: January 04, 2013Request for Entry of Default (All Unknowns Included) filed by Lyon, John W.
Date: December 14, 2012Proof of Service of 5-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Lyon, John W.
Date: December 14, 2012Writ of Possession issued.
Date: January 04, 2013Writ of Possession Returned - Wholly Satisfied filed by Lyon, John W.
Date: January 29, 2013For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.