Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
William Ludwig Executor Of Estate Of Lora A Ludwig, filed a(n) Unlawful Detainer - Property case represented by Mckinley, James R, against Horning, Linda, represented by Rutman, Zachary D, in the jurisdiction of San Diego County. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
||
Filing DateOctober 31, 2012 |
CategoryCivil - Limited |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions14 days |
Filing LocationSan Diego County, CA |
Matter TypeUnlawful Detainer |
|
Case Cycle Time1888 days |
Case initiation form printed.
Date: 2012-10-31T00:00:00Original Summons filed by William Ludwig Executor of Estate of Lora A Ludwig. Refers to: Horning, Linda
Date: 2012-10-31T00:00:00Unlawful Detainer Court Trial scheduled for 12/04/2012 at 08:30:00 AM at Central in C-05 .
Date: November 19, 2012Answer filed by Horning, Linda.
Date: 2012-11-07T00:00:00Judgment entered.
Date: December 04, 2012Order, Stipulation and Oath for Temporary Judge signed and filed.
Date: December 04, 2012Order on Court Fee Waiver filed by Horning, Linda.
Date: 2012-11-08T00:00:00Notice of Assignment of Shriver Counsel filed by Horning, Linda.
Date: 2012-11-07T00:00:00Writ of Possession issued.
Date: December 14, 2012Minutes finalized for Unlawful Detainer Court Trial heard 12/04/2012 08:30:00 AM.
Date: December 04, 2012For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.