Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Island Village; Dba : Island Palms, filed a(n) Unlawful Detainer - Property case represented by Bouzane, John E, against Strawter, Tera, in the jurisdiction of San Diego County. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
||
Filing DateOctober 31, 2012 |
CategoryCivil - Limited |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions30 days |
Filing LocationSan Diego County, CA |
Matter TypeUnlawful Detainer |
|
Case Cycle Time841 days |
Case initiation form printed.
Date: 2012-10-31T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Island Village. Refers to: Kelly, Keri
Date: 2012-10-31T00:00:00Amended Complaint (FIRST) filed by Island Village. Refers to: Strawter, Tera
Date: 2012-11-16T00:00:00Original Summons filed by Island Village. Refers to: Kelly, Keri
Date: 2012-10-31T00:00:00Complaint Demanding Less than $10,000 filed by Island Village. Refers to: Kelly, Keri; Strawter, Tera
Date: 2012-10-31T00:00:00Original Summons (AMENDED) filed by Island Village.
Date: 2012-11-19T00:00:00Writ of Execution Returned - Unsatisfied filed by Island Village.
Date: February 19, 2015Writ of Execution submitted by Island Village rejected on 09/25/2014.
Date: September 25, 2014Request for Dismissal of Does filed by Island Village. Refers to: Strawter, Tera
Date: February 11, 2013Proof of Service of Summons & Complaint - Unnamed Occupants filed by Island Village.
Date: 2012-11-29T00:00:00Writ of Execution Returned - Wholly Satisfied filed by Island Village.
Date: 2013-01-15T00:00:00Application for Entry of Judgment filed by Island Village. Refers to: Strawter, Tera
Date: February 11, 2013Substitution of Attorney filed by Island Village.
Date: September 19, 2014Request for Entry of Default (Includes All Unknowns) filed by Island Village. Refers to: Strawter, Tera
Date: 2012-11-29T00:00:00Writ of Possession issued.
Date: 2012-12-03T00:00:00Writ of Execution issued.
Date: October 15, 2014Judgment by Default by Clerk for Possession Only filed by Island Village. Refers to: Strawter, Tera
Date: 2012-11-30T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.