Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Mountain View Properties Ltd, filed a(n) Unlawful Detainer - Property case represented by Alter, Richard C, against Cruz, Vanessa, Cruz, Armando, Boles, Oliver ; Aka : Bowles, Oliver, in the jurisdiction of San Diego County. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
||
Filing DateOctober 30, 2012 |
CategoryCivil - Limited |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions30 days |
Filing LocationSan Diego County, CA |
Matter TypeUnlawful Detainer |
|
Case Cycle Time1889 days |
Case initiation form printed.
Date: 2012-10-30T00:00:00Answer filed by Boles, Oliver; CRUZ, ARMANDO; Cruz, Vanessa.
Date: 2012-11-05T00:00:00Order on Court Fee Waiver (Granted in Whole) filed by Boles, Oliver.
Date: 2012-11-05T00:00:00Order on Court Fee Waiver (Granted in Whole) filed by Cruz, Vanessa.
Date: 2012-11-05T00:00:00Order on Court Fee Waiver (Granted in Whole) filed by CRUZ, ARMANDO.
Date: 2012-11-05T00:00:00Writ of Possession issued.
Date: December 11, 2012Request for Entry of Default of Unnamed Tenants filed by Mountain View Properties LTD.
Date: 2012-11-14T00:00:00Order, Stipulation and Oath for Temporary Judge signed and filed.
Date: November 29, 2012Minutes finalized for Unlawful Detainer Court Trial heard 11/29/2012 01:30:00 PM.
Date: November 29, 2012Unlawful Detainer Court Trial scheduled for 11/29/2012 at 01:30:00 PM at Central in C-05 .
Date: 2012-11-08T00:00:00Proof of Service of Summons & Complaint - Unnamed Occupants filed by Mountain View Properties LTD.
Date: 2012-11-14T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.