Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Utopia Management Inc, filed a(n) Unlawful Detainer - Property case represented by Mendez, Alejandra, against Rost, Patrick, represented by Curry, Christian A M, in the jurisdiction of San Diego County. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
||
Filing DateOctober 22, 2012 |
CategoryCivil - Limited |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions16 days |
Filing LocationSan Diego County, CA |
Matter TypeUnlawful Detainer |
|
Case Cycle Time2261 days |
Substitution of Attorney filed by Rost, Patrick.
Date: 2012-11-26T00:00:00Order, Stipulation and Oath for Temporary Judge signed and filed.
Date: 2012-11-26T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Ex Parte heard 11/26/2012 01:15:00 PM. (Subsequently amended - See ROA # 24)
Date: 2012-11-26T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Motion Hearing (Civil) heard 12/05/2012 01:30:00 PM.
Date: 2012-12-05T00:00:00Motion to Set Aside Default (and supporting declarations) filed by Rost, Patrick.
Date: 2012-11-27T00:00:00Writ of Execution issued.
Date: December 04, 2014Writ of Possession issued.
Date: 2012-11-08T00:00:00Writ of Attachment Returned filed by Utopia Management Inc.
Date: June 29, 2015Proof of Service of Summons & Complaint - Unnamed Occupants filed by Utopia Management Inc.
Date: 2012-11-07T00:00:00Order on Court Fee Waiver (denied) filed by Rost, Patrick.
Date: 2012-11-26T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Utopia Management Inc. Refers to: Rost, Patrick
Date: 2012-10-22T00:00:00Case initiation form printed.
Date: 2012-10-22T00:00:00Writ of Possession Returned - Wholly Satisfied filed by Utopia Management Inc.
Date: 2012-12-20T00:00:00Stipulation for Entry of Judgment filed by Utopia Management Inc. Refers to: Rost, Patrick
Date: 2012-12-05T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Ex Parte heard 11/26/2012 01:15:00 PM. (As Amended)
Date: 2012-11-26T00:00:00Original Summons filed by Utopia Management Inc. Refers to: Rost, Patrick
Date: 2012-10-22T00:00:00Miscellaneous Minute Order Finalized.
Date: 2012-11-27T00:00:00Complaint Demanding Less than $10,000 filed by Utopia Management Inc. Refers to: Rost, Patrick
Date: 2012-10-22T00:00:00Order, Stipulation and Oath for Temporary Judge signed and filed.
Date: 2012-12-05T00:00:00Ex Parte Application - Other and Supporting Documents (Stay the lockout) filed by Rost, Patrick.
Date: 2012-11-26T00:00:00Writ of Execution issued.
Date: July 26, 2017Writ of Execution Returned - Unsatisfied filed by Utopia Management Inc.
Date: April 09, 2018For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.