Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Kidd, Daniel L., filed a(n) Unlawful Detainer - Property case represented by Walker, Justin, against Nva, Richard ; Aka : Nua, Richard, Holly, Dana, in the jurisdiction of San Diego County. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
||
Filing DateDecember 13, 2012 |
CategoryCivil - Limited |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions21 days |
Filing LocationSan Diego County, CA |
Matter TypeUnlawful Detainer |
|
Case Cycle Time43 days |
Writ of Possession Returned - Unsatisfied filed by Kidd, Daniel L..
Date: January 14, 2013Original Summons filed by Kidd, Daniel L.. Refers to: Nva, Richard; Holly, Dana
Date: 2012-12-13T00:00:00Case initiation form printed.
Date: 2012-12-13T00:00:00Complaint Demanding Less than $10,000 filed by Kidd, Daniel L.. Refers to: Nva, Richard; Holly, Dana
Date: 2012-12-13T00:00:00Proof of Service of Summons & Complaint - Unnamed Occupants filed by Kidd, Daniel L..
Date: January 03, 2013Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Kidd, Daniel L.. Refers to: Nva, Richard; Holly, Dana
Date: 2012-12-13T00:00:00Writ of Possession Returned - Wholly Satisfied filed by Kidd, Daniel L..
Date: January 25, 2013Writ of Possession issued.
Date: 2013-01-03T00:00:00Writ of Possession issued.
Date: January 14, 2013For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.