Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Cavalry Spv I, Llc As Assignee Of Hsbc Consumer Lending Usa Inc Beneficial, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Winn, Brian N, against Igartua, Gabriel V; Aka : Igartua, Gabriel, in the jurisdiction of San Diego County. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts with William S. Cannon presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateDecember 30, 2011 |
CategoryCivil - Limited |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions417 days |
Filing LocationSan Diego County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Cycle Time2965 days |
Case initiation form printed.
Date: 2012-01-03T00:00:00OSC - Why Case Should Not be Dismissed scheduled for 10/09/2013 at 08:30:00 AM at Central in C-07 .
Date: 2013-05-07T00:00:00Case reassigned from Cannon,William to Medel,Kenneth effective 02/25/2012
Date: 2012-02-25T00:00:00Case reassigned from Medel,Kenneth to C-07 effective 11/18/2012.
Date: 2012-11-18T00:00:00Writ of Execution issued.
Date: 2017-05-03T00:00:00Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (Minutes Only) SD generated.
Date: July 26, 2017For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.